Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2319101

EP2319101 - ENERGY DEVICE WITH INTEGRAL COLLECTOR SURFACE FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC ENERGY HARVESTING AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sapurast Research LLC
1209 Orange Street
Corporation Trust Center
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
[2015/17]
Former [2011/19]For all designated states
Infinite Power Solutions, Inc.
11149 Bradford Road
Littleton, CO 80127 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRANTNER, Paul, C.
29259 Thunderbolt Circle
Conifer CO 80433 / US
 [2011/19]
Representative(s)Barnfather, Karl Jon
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2014/04]
Former [2011/19]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date09807167.311.08.2009
[2011/19]
WO2009US53412
Priority number, dateUS20080087927P11.08.2008         Original published format: US 87927 P
[2011/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010019577
Date:18.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2319101
Date:11.05.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010
[2011/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2319101
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.02.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/46, H01L31/0224, H01L31/042, H02J7/00, H02J17/00, H02J7/02
[2015/20]
Former International [2013/33]H02J7/02, H01L31/042, H01M10/46, H01L31/0224
Former International [2011/19]H01L35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Former [2011/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:STROMVORRICHTUNG MIT INTEGRIERTER SAMMELFLÄCHE ZUR GEWINNUNG ELEKTOMAGNETISCHER ENERGIE SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2011/19]
English:ENERGY DEVICE WITH INTEGRAL COLLECTOR SURFACE FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC ENERGY HARVESTING AND METHOD THEREOF[2011/19]
French:DISPOSITIF À ÉNERGIE DOTÉ D UNE SURFACE DE COLLECTEUR SOLIDAIRE POUR LA COLLECTE D UNE ÉNERGIE ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ[2011/19]
Entry into regional phase10.02.2011National basic fee paid 
10.02.2011Search fee paid 
10.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
10.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/19]
21.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2015Fee for grant paid
21.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.11.2013
Opposition(s)05.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
09.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.08.2009
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/33]HU11.08.2009
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2018/29]HU11.08.2009
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU11.08.2009
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2017/23]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6127799  (KRISHNAN RAJESH [US]) [X] 1-24 * figures 1-7 * * column 3, lines 25-40 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 10 * * claims 1-11,24 * [I] 25;
 [X]WO2006077192  (OTICON AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-11,15,21-23 * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 22 * * claims 1-6 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US6016046  (KAITE OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11,14,15,21-23 * figures 4,5 * * column 1, lines 9-12 * * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 3 *;
 [X]US2007222681  (GREENE CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-13,18-23 * figures 1-26 * * claims 1-31 *
International search[X]US2007222681  (GREENE CHARLES E [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007184345  (NEUDECKER BERND J [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007202395  (SNYDER SHAWN W [US], et al);
 [Y]US7400253  (COHEN MARC H [US]);
 [Y]US7095372  (SOLER CASTANY JORDI [ES], et al);
 [Y]  - BALANIS, C., "Antenna Theory", Analysis and Design., JOHN WILEY AND SONS., vol. 3RD.ED., pages 816 - 818, XP008142809
ExaminationUS2003231106
 WO9739491
by applicantUS7088031
 US20070687032