Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2332113

EP2332113 - METHODS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERING A PREPAID CARD TO A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.07.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MasterCard International Incorporated
2000 Purchase Street
Purchase, NY 10577 / US
[2012/51]
Former [2011/24]For all designated states
Vivotech, Inc.
451 El Camino Real 2nd Floor
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUMAR, Pradeep
4037 Oroville Court
Fremont CA 94555 / US
 [2011/24]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/45]de Zeeuw, Johan Diederick , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2011/24]Anderson, Angela Mary
Murgitroyd & Company Immeuble Atlantis 55, Allée Pierre Ziller Sophia Antipolis
FR-06560 Valbonne / FR
Application number, filing date09807223.412.08.2009
[2011/24]
WO2009US53556
Priority number, dateUS2008019056412.08.2008         Original published format: US 190564
[2011/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010019670
Date:18.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2332113
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010
[2011/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.05.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q40/00, G06Q20/00
[2011/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND COMPUTERLESBARE MEDIEN ZUR ELEKTRONISCHEN BEREITSTELLUNG EINER WERTKARTE FÜR EIN MOBILGERÄT[2011/24]
English:METHODS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERING A PREPAID CARD TO A MOBILE DEVICE[2011/24]
French:PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET SUPPORTS APTES À ÊTRE LUS PAR ORDINATEUR POUR DISTRIBUER ÉLECTRONIQUEMENT UNE CARTE PRÉPAYÉE À UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE[2011/24]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2011National basic fee paid 
03.03.2011Search fee paid 
03.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/24]
20.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2014Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.03.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination15.05.2014Appeal received No.  T2040/14
24.07.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003199265  (AOYAMA HARUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0090]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-15;
 [I]US2008058014  (KHAN MOHAMMAD [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-4B; claims 1-28 *;
 [I]KR20030068226  (OPENTECH CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-5; claims 1-9 *;
 [I]KR20030000447  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-11; claims 1-13 *;
 [I]JP2003271815  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * claims 1-3 *;
 [I]JP2006040249  (KD NET CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[X]US2008052164  (ABIFAKER BASIL MUNIR [US]);
 [A]KR20070030351  (ICASH CO., LTD.);
 [A]KR20000054540  (LEE PIL WOO [KR]);
 [A]US2006080111  (HOMEIER-BEALS THOMAS E [US])