Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2379440

EP2379440 - Method for producing thin, free-standing layers of solid state materials with structured surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/43]METHOD FOR PRODUCING THIN, FREE-STANDING LAYERS OF SOLID STATE MATERIALS WITH STRUCTURED SURFACES
[2012/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.02.2014
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 07.10.2015  [2015/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siltectra GmbH
Manfred-von-Ardenne-Ring 20
01099 Dresden / DE
[2013/16]
Former [2011/43]For all designated states
Siltectra GmbH
Manfred-von-Ardenne-Ring 20
01099 Dresden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LICHTENSTEIGER, Lukas
Spitzackerstr.4
8057 Zurich / CH
 [2011/43]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2013/16]
Former [2012/24]Ascherl, Andreas , et al
Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr
Patentanwälte
Friedrich-Herschel-Straße 9
81679 München / DE
Former [2011/43]Ascherl, Andreas , et al
Heisse Kursawe Eversheds Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Maximiliansplatz 5
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date09807540.118.12.2009
WO2009EP67539
Priority number, dateUS20080140466P23.12.2008         Original published format: US 140466 P
US20090175447P04.05.2009         Original published format: US 175447 P
US20090176105P06.05.2009         Original published format: US 176105 P
[2011/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010072675
Date:01.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2379440
Date:26.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010
[2011/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2379440
Date:17.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:B81C1/00, H01L21/78, H01L21/304, B28D1/22
[2012/45]
Former International [2011/43]B81C1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erzeugung dünner, freistehender Schichten aus Festkörpermaterialien mit strukturierten Flächen[2012/51]
English:Method for producing thin, free-standing layers of solid state materials with structured surfaces[2012/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MINCES COUCHES LIBRES DE MATÉRIAUX à l'état solide AVEC DES SURFACES STRUCTURÉES[2012/45]
Former [2011/43]VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG DÜNNER, FREISTEHENDER SCHICHTEN AUS FESTKÖRPERMATERIALIEN MIT STRUKTURIERTEN FLÄCHEN
Former [2011/43]METHOD FOR PRODUCING THIN, FREE-STANDING LAYERS OF SOLID STATE MATERIALS WITH STRUCTURED SURFACES
Former [2011/43]PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MINCES COUCHES LIBRES DE MATÉRIAUX SEMI-CONDUCTEURS AVEC DES SURFACES STRUCTURÉES
Entry into regional phase18.07.2011National basic fee paid 
18.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/43]
11.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2013Fee for grant paid
04.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13163963.5  / EP2620408
EP13163979.1  / EP2620409
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2012
Opposition(s)20.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.12.2009
AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.12.2013
LU18.12.2013
ES19.12.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]HU18.12.2009
AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.12.2013
LU18.12.2013
ES19.12.2013
Former [2015/33]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.12.2013
LU18.12.2013
ES19.12.2013
Former [2015/32]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MK17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.12.2013
LU18.12.2013
Former [2015/24]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
SM17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.12.2013
LU18.12.2013
Former [2015/21]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.12.2013
LU18.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.12.2013
LU18.12.2013
Former [2014/38]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
LU18.12.2013
Former [2014/11]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/51]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
NO17.07.2013
GR18.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
NO17.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT17.04.2013
NO17.07.2013
PT19.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]  - DROSS F ET AL, "Stress-induced large-area lift-off of crystalline Si films", APPLIED PHYSICS A; MATERIALS SCIENCE & PROCESSING, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20070705), vol. 89, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1007/S00339-007-4195-2, ISSN 1432-0630, pages 149 - 152, XP019540500 [A] 1,34,36 * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 149 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00339-007-4195-2
by applicant   - "Stress-induced large-area lift-off of crystalline Si films", APPLIED PHYSISCS A, MATERIAL SCIENCE & PROCESSING, vol. 89, no. 1