Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2317496

EP2317496 - LED DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harvatek Corporation
No. 18, Lane 522, Sec 5
Jhonghua Road
Hsinchu City 300
Taiwan / TW
[2013/46]
Former [2011/18]For all designated states
Lite PA Co., Ltd.
7F, No. 8, Wu Quan 2nd Road Wu Ku Industry Park Xin Zhuang City
Taipei County / TW
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Hui-Chung
7F, No. 8, Wu Quan 2nd Road Wu Ku Industry Park
Xin Zhuang City Taipei County / TW
 [2011/18]
Representative(s)Reichert, Sabine , et al
Reichert & Lindner Patentanwälte
Bismarckplatz 8
93047 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/25]Reichert, Sabine , et al
Reichert & Kollegen Bismarckplatz 8
93047 Regensburg / DE
Former [2011/18]Schuhbiesser, Irmgard Gertrud
Reichert & Kollegen Bismarckplatz 8
93047 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date09809245.527.08.2009
[2011/18]
WO2009CN73556
Priority number, dateCN20082147025U29.08.2008         Original published format: CN 200820147025 U
[2011/18]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010022660
Date:04.03.2010
Language:ZH
[2010/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2317496
Date:04.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.03.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/32
[2011/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/18]
TitleGerman:LED-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2011/18]
English:LED DISPLAY DEVICE[2011/18]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À DEL[2011/18]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2010Translation filed 
09.07.2010National basic fee paid 
09.07.2010Search fee paid 
09.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2010Examination requested  [2011/18]
15.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2013Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008018798  (PARK KYONG-TAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0003] , [0041] - [0043] - [0077] - [0084]; figures 1,3,5 *;
 [X]US2006268003  (TANASE SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0066] - [0070] - [0074] - [0077] - [0184]; figures 1,2,3 *;
 [X]US2007257943  (MILLER MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0034] , [0046] , [0054] , [0072] - [0076] - [0086]; figures 3,6 *
International search[X]CN101114423  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [X]CN1697009  (YOUDA PHOTOELECTRIC CO LTD [CN]);
 [X]CN1864188  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]);
 [X]EP1947632  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [X]WO2006080237  (SHARP KK [JP], et al);
 [XP]CN201259772Y  (SHENZHEN DISPLED TECH CO LTD [CN])