blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2279856

EP2279856 - GLUING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CORRUGATED BOARD SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Printing & Packaging Machinery, Ltd.
1-1, Itosaki Minami 1-chome Mihara
Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP
[2011/05]
Inventor(s)01 / HATANO, Osamu
c/o Paper&Printing Machinery Division
MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
1-1 Itozaki Minami 1-Chome
Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP
02 / SUGIMOTO, Kazuya
c/o Paper&Printing Machinery Division
MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
1-1 Itozaki Minami 1-Chome
Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP
 [2016/11]
Former [2011/05]01 / HATANO, Osamu
c/o Paper&Printing Machinery Division MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Itozaki Minami 1-Chome
Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP
02 / SUGIMOTO, Kazuya
c/o Paper&Printing Machinery Division MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Itozaki Minami 1-Chome
Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP
Representative(s)Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158 rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/11]Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2011/05]Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date09809809.818.08.2009
[2011/05]
WO2009JP64461
Priority number, dateJP2008021807527.08.2008         Original published format: JP 2008218075
[2011/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2010024156
Date:04.03.2010
Language:JA
[2010/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2279856
Date:02.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2279856
Date:16.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.03.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:B31B1/62, B05C5/02
[2015/24]
CPC:
B05C5/0275 (EP,KR,US); B31B50/624 (EP,KR,US); B31B50/81 (KR)
Former IPC [2011/05]B31B1/62
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Former [2011/05]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:LEIMVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR WELLPAPPEBAHNEN[2011/05]
English:GLUING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CORRUGATED BOARD SHEET[2011/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COLLAGE POUR FEUILLE DE CARTON ONDULÉ[2011/05]
Entry into regional phase22.10.2010Translation filed 
22.10.2010National basic fee paid 
22.10.2010Search fee paid 
22.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/05]
29.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2016Fee for grant paid
07.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.10.2015
Opposition(s)19.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
07.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.08.2009
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
GB18.08.2016
IE18.08.2016
LU18.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
[2018/33]
Former [2018/29]HU18.08.2009
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
GB18.08.2016
IE18.08.2016
LU18.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU18.08.2009
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
GB18.08.2016
IE18.08.2016
LU18.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
GB18.08.2016
IE18.08.2016
LU18.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/23]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/20]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/40]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006081727  (STEPANIAK JUDE A [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0041] , [0044]; figures 3, 4, 7 *
International search[A]JPH03133719  (FUJI MACHINERY CO);
 [A]JPH10211664  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [A]JP2000334351  (NORDSON KK);
 [A]JP2001030380  (RENGO CO LTD);
 [A]JP2003154583  (SANYO TRADING CO, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.