Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2344047

EP2344047 - SURGICAL STRING APPLICATOR FOR ANASTOMOSIS SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/29]SURGICAL STRING APPLICATOR FOR ANASTOMOSIS SURGERY AND METHOD OF USE
[2019/08]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unique Surgical Innovations, LLC
8232 Canopy Terrace
Parkland, FL 33076 / US
[2019/26]
Former [2011/29]For all designated states
Unique Surgical Innovations, LLC
9988 Sundance Court
Parkland, FL 33076 / US
Inventor(s)01 / REGADAS, Francisco, Sergio Pinheiro
Av Atilano de Moura 430, Apt. 200
Patriolino Ribeiro, 60810-180 Fortaleza - Ceara / BR
 [2019/26]
Former [2011/29]01 / REGADAS, Francisco, Sergio Pinheiro
Av Edilson Brasil Soares 1892 Edson Queiroz
60834-220 Fortaleza - Ceara / BR
Representative(s)Schmid, Wolfgang , et al
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Strasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/42]
Former [2012/49]Becker Kurig Straus
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Former [2011/29]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date09813562.709.09.2009
[2011/29]
WO2009US56411
Priority number, dateUS2008028315210.09.2008         Original published format: US 283152
[2011/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010030707
Date:18.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2344047
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2010
[2011/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2344047
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.03.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04
[2011/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/26]
Former [2011/29]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHER SCHNURAPPLIKATOR FÜR DIE ANASTOMOSE-CHIRURGIE[2019/08]
English:SURGICAL STRING APPLICATOR FOR ANASTOMOSIS SURGERY[2019/08]
French:APPLICATEUR DE FIL DE SUTURE POUR ANASTOMOSE CHIRURGICALE[2019/08]
Former [2011/29]CHIRURGISCHER SCHNURAPPLIKATOR FÜR DIE ANASTOMOSE-CHIRURGIE UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN
Former [2011/29]SURGICAL STRING APPLICATOR FOR ANASTOMOSIS SURGERY AND METHOD OF USE
Former [2011/29]APPLICATEUR DE FIL DE SUTURE POUR ANASTOMOSE CHIRURGICALE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase11.04.2011National basic fee paid 
11.04.2011Search fee paid 
11.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/29]
21.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2019Fee for grant paid
15.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.02.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
10.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
20.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201204   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.2012
30.09.201608   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/49]FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2007142851  (SIXTO ROBERT JR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * abstract * [I] 14,15;
 [XI]US5425489  (SHICHMAN DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * the whole document * [I] 14,15;
 [XI]US5741274  (LENKER JAY A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * [I] 14,15;
 [XI]US2006264987  (SGRO JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * [I] 14,15;
 [X]US2005216036  (NAKAO NAOMI L [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11 * abstract *;
 [XI]US2006079913  (WHITFIELD KENNETH H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * the whole document * [I] 14,15;
 [XI]US2007131732  (HOLSTEN HENRY E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * abstract * [I] 14,15;
 [A]EP0117981  (ANTEBI ELIAHU PROF) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5383882  (BUESS GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US7131970  (MOSES MICHAEL C [US], et al);
 [Y]US6497258  (FLANNERY STEVEN E [US], et al);
 [Y]US6368340  (MALECKI WILLIAM W [US], et al);
 [Y]US5368215  (GREEN DAVID T [US], et al);
 [Y]US3683926  (SUZUKI JIRO)