Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2348180

EP2348180 - PANEL FASTENING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.2016
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Racworth Co., Ltd.
Rm. 302, Bldg. 2
No. 2966 Jinke Rd.
Zhangjiang, Pudong
Shanghai 201203 / CN
[2012/51]
Former [2011/30]For all designated states
Wu, Wenqiang
No.1655 Lane 2727 Hunan Road
Shanghai 201315 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Wu, Wenqiang
No. 1655, Lane 2727, Hunan Road
Shanghai 201315 / CN
 [2014/41]
Former [2012/51]01 / Wu, Wnqiang
No. 1655, Lane 2727, Hunan Road
Shanghai 201315 / CN
Former [2011/30]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel
Montgelasstrasse 2
81679 Munich / DE
[2015/10]
Former [2011/30]Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel
Montgelasstrasse 2
81679 Munich / DE
Application number, filing date09814006.417.08.2009
[2011/30]
WO2009CN73302
Priority number, dateCN2008120002118.09.2008         Original published format: CN200810200021
[2011/30]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010031286
Date:25.03.2010
Language:ZH
[2010/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2348180
Date:27.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2348180
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN25.03.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:E05D15/00, E04D13/18, F24J2/52, E04B7/00, E04B9/00
[2011/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/30]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PLATTENBEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM[2011/30]
English:PANEL FASTENING SYSTEM[2011/30]
French:SYSTÈME DE FIXATION D'UNE PLAQUE[2011/30]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2011Translation filed 
13.04.2011National basic fee paid 
13.04.2011Search fee paid 
13.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/30]
27.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2015Fee for grant paid
19.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2014
Opposition(s)07.12.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.08.2009
AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
BG04.03.2015
CY04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MK04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
SM04.03.2015
TR04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB17.08.2015
IE17.08.2015
LU17.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]HU17.08.2009
AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
BG04.03.2015
CY04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
SM04.03.2015
TR04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB17.08.2015
IE17.08.2015
LU17.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2017/21]AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
MT04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB17.08.2015
IE17.08.2015
LU17.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/36]AT04.03.2015
BE04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB17.08.2015
IE17.08.2015
LU17.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
FR31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/34]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
GB17.08.2015
IE17.08.2015
LU17.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/33]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
IE17.08.2015
LU17.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU17.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/18]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
MC04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU17.08.2015
Former [2016/17]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
LU17.08.2015
Former [2016/12]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SI04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/07]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
DK04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2016/03]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
IT04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/50]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
PL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
IS04.07.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/49]AT04.03.2015
CZ04.03.2015
EE04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
RO04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
SK04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
PT06.07.2015
Former [2015/41]AT04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
NL04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/39]AT04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
LV04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/38]AT04.03.2015
ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/37]ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
GR05.06.2015
Former [2015/36]ES04.03.2015
FI04.03.2015
HR04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
SE04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
Former [2015/35]ES04.03.2015
LT04.03.2015
NO04.06.2015
Former [2015/33]ES04.03.2015
Documents cited:Search[XDI]US7260918  (LIEBENDORFER JOHN E [US]) [XD] 1,2,7 * figure - * [I] 3,5,6;
 [X]DE102005001654  (CONERGY AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * figure - *;
 [X]JPS5787561  (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO) [X] 1,2,7 * figure - *;
 [X]DE20204146U  (SCHUECO INT KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * figure - *;
 [X]JP2005175236  (CANON KK) [X] 1,7 * abstract *;
 [X]JP2001065121  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1,7 * figure - *;
 [X]WO03098126  (ALCOA NEDERLAND BV [NL]; SCHAUFELI ALAIN FERDINAND [NL]) [X] 1,7 * figure - *;
 [X]JP2007262764  (YANE GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1,7 * figure - *
International search[Y]US5048232  (MIYAGAWA TOKIO [JP], et al);
 [Y]US2006156651  (GENSCHOREK GIDO [DE]);
 [XP]CN101387151  (WENQIANG WU [CN]);
 [XP]CN201284536Y  (WENQIANG WU [CN]);
 [A]US2008053008  (OHKOSHI YASUSHI [JP], et al)
by applicantDE19717996
 US6105317
 US6360491
 DE10132557
 US7260918
 US2006086382
 US2006156651