Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2337728

EP2337728 - REINFORCED STRUCTURE OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sika Technology AG
Zugerstrasse 50
6340 Baar / CH
[2011/26]
Inventor(s)01 / KRAUSHAAR, Thomas
Lehenstrasse 43
CH-8037 Zürich / CH
 [2011/26]
Representative(s)Sika Patent Attorneys
c/o Sika Technology AG
Corp. IP Dept.
Tüffenwies 16
Postfach
8048 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/36]Sika Patent Attorneys
c/o Sika Technology AG Tüffenwies 16-22
8048 Zürich / CH
Former [2011/26]Sika Patent Attorneys
c/o Sika Technology AG Tüffenwies 16-22
8048 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date09814121.118.09.2009
[2011/26]
WO2009EP62083
Priority number, dateEP2008016469019.09.2008         Original published format: EP 08164690
[2011/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010031827
Date:25.03.2010
Language:DE
[2010/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2337728
Date:29.06.2011
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010
[2011/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2337728
Date:04.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:B62D21/15, B62D29/00
[2011/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERSTÄRKTE STRUKTUR EINES FAHRZEUGS[2011/26]
English:REINFORCED STRUCTURE OF A VEHICLE[2011/26]
French:STRUCTURE RENFORCEE D'UN VEHICULE[2013/18]
Former [2011/26]STRUCTURE RENFORCÉE D'UN VÉHICULE
Entry into regional phase19.04.2011National basic fee paid 
19.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/26]
29.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2013Fee for grant paid
23.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.06.2014  11.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L & L Products Europe S.A.S.
1 Rue Lindberg ZA Activeum, Altorf
67129 Molsheim, cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Wolff, Felix
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/13]
Opponent(s)01  03.06.2014  11.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
L & L Products Europe S.A.S.
1 Rue Lindberg ZA Activeum, Altorf
67129 Molsheim, cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Wolff, Felix
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Former [2014/28]
Opponent(s)01  03.06.2014   
L & L Products Europe S.A.S.
1 Rue Lindberg ZA Activeum, Altorf
67129 Molsheim, cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Bawden, Peter Charles
Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden
Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
11.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
27.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.06.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition23.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1936/16
27.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
14.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.01.2013Request for further processing filed
23.01.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.03.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.09.2009
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MK04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
TR04.09.2013
IE18.09.2013
LU18.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
GB04.12.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
AT18.09.2014
[2016/12]
Former [2015/34]HU18.09.2009
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MK04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
TR04.09.2013
IE18.09.2013
LU18.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
GB04.12.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2015/32]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MK04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
TR04.09.2013
IE18.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
GB04.12.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2015/24]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
IE18.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
GB04.12.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/51]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
IE18.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
GB04.12.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/41]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
IE18.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/38]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
IE18.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/34]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
IE18.09.2013
BE30.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/33]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
IE18.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/29]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/28]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/24]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
Former [2014/23]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
Former [2014/22]CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY24.07.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY24.07.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY24.07.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
Former [2014/09]HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO04.12.2013
Cited inInternational search[XDAY]US6378933  (SCHOEN ROBERT M [US] ET AL) [XD] 1-3,5,7-8,10,12 * figure 3 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 38 * [A] 13 [Y] 4,6,9,11;
 [YA]US6247287  (TAKABATAKE YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [Y] 4,6,9,11 * abstract * [A] 1,7,13;
 [XA]US6199940  (HOPTON GREGORY W [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7-10,12 * the whole document * [A] 13;
 [XA]JP2002173049  (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 1-2,4-5,7,9-10,12 * abstract * [A] 13;
 [A]DE19934666  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0141950  (L & L PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1,7,13 * page 3, line 27 - page 7, line 14 *