Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2344212

EP2344212 - DRUG ELUTING SUPERHYDROPHOBIC COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.06.2014  [2014/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innovative Surface Technologies, Inc.
1000 Westgate Drive, Suite 115
Saint Paul, MN 55114 / US
[2011/29]
Inventor(s)01 / TATON, Kristin, S.
2389 Greenbrier Circle
Little Canada MN 55117 / US
02 / GUIRE, Patrick, E.
711 1/2 Drillane Road North
Hopkins MN 55305 / US
03 / LAWIN, Laurie, R.
3170 Bent Tree Hills Drive
New Brighton MN 55112 / US
04 / WEN, Jie
8866 Belvedere Drive
Eden Prairie MN 5347 / US
 [2011/29]
Representative(s)Elend, Almut Susanne , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Elend, Almut Susanne , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Former [2011/29]Elend, Almut Susanne , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date09815046.915.09.2009
[2011/29]
WO2009US56920
Priority number, dateUS20080098324P19.09.2008         Original published format: US 98324 P
[2011/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010033482
Date:25.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2344212
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010
[2011/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU25.03.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/44, A61L27/48, A61L29/12, A61L31/12
[2011/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/29]
TitleGerman:ARZNEIMITTEL FREISETZENDE SUPERHYDROPHOBE BESCHICHTUNGEN[2011/29]
English:DRUG ELUTING SUPERHYDROPHOBIC COATINGS[2011/29]
French:ENROBAGES SUPERHYDROPHOBES À ÉLUTION DE MÉDICAMENTS[2011/29]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2011National basic fee paid 
18.04.2011Search fee paid 
18.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/29]
04.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/26]
13.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1283077  (CREAVIS TECH & INNOVATION GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,9-14 * examples;; claims 3,4 *;
 [A]WO2008106494  (INNOVATIVE SURFACE TECHNOLOGIE [US]; LAWIN LAURIE R [US]; GUIRE PATRIC) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2007092179  (MED INST INC [US]; RUANE PATRICK [US]) [X] 1,7,9-14 * paragraph [0033]; claims 1,5,6,11; table 1 *;
 [XI]US2006204738  (DUBROW ROBERT S [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,9,12-15 * claims 11,90 * [I] 1-15
International search[X]WO03030879  (SURMODICS, INC.);
 [Y]US6096070  (RAGHEB ET AL.);
 [X]US4731080  (GALIN);
 [X]US2005181015  (ZHONG);
 [X]WO2005107455  (BACTERIN INTERNATIONAL, INC);
 [X]US2004162609  (HOSSAINY ET AL.);
 [A]WO2008106494  (INNOVATIVE SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.)