Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2338416

EP2338416 - LINE-OF-SIGHT DIRECTION DETERMINATION DEVICE AND LINE-OF-SIGHT DIRECTION DETERMINATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.02.2020 [2020/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
[2019/09]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue
Suite 200
Torrance CA 90503 / US
Former [2011/26]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TSUKIZAWA, Sotaro
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / MARUYA, Kensuke
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company
7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2019/09]
Former [2011/26]01 / TSUKIZAWARA, Sotaro
c/o Panasonic Corporation, Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / MARUYA, Kensuke
c/o Panasonic Corporation, Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/09]
Former [2011/26]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date09815894.225.09.2009
[2011/26]
WO2009JP04853
Priority number, dateJP2008024887726.09.2008         Original published format: JP 2008248877
[2011/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010035472
Date:01.04.2010
Language:JA
[2010/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2338416
Date:29.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2338416
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.04.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/113, A61B5/18, G06T7/68, G06T7/73, G06K9/00
[2018/41]
Former International [2018/07]A61B3/113, A61B5/18, G06T1/00
Former International [2011/26]A61B5/18, A61B3/113, G06T1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/09]
Former [2011/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER SICHTLINIENRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER SICHTLINIENRICHTUNG[2011/26]
English:LINE-OF-SIGHT DIRECTION DETERMINATION DEVICE AND LINE-OF-SIGHT DIRECTION DETERMINATION METHOD[2011/26]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA DIRECTION D'UNE LIGNE DE VISION[2011/26]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2011Translation filed 
28.03.2011National basic fee paid 
28.03.2011Search fee paid 
28.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/26]
25.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2019Fee for grant paid
14.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2018
Opposition(s)28.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.02.2019
CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
PL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/52]CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
PL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
SM27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/49]CZ27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
EE27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
RO27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
SK27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
IT27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI27.02.2019
HR27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
LV27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
IS27.06.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2005304544  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0011] - [0024] *;
 [A]WO2008007781  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0071] , [0072] , [0073] *;
 [A]JPH08297019  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] - [0058]; figure 17 *
International search[A]JP2008126329  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP);
 [A]WO2008007781  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH024313  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [A]JP2002119478  (CANON KK)