EP2329524 - METHOD OF PATTERNING A METAL ON A VERTICAL SIDEWALL OF AN EXCAVATED FEATURE, METHOD OF FORMING AN EMBEDDED MIM CAPACITOR USING SAME, AND EMBEDDED MEMORY DEVICE PRODUCED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEATING, Steven J. 16079 SW Waxwing Place Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
LINDERT, Nick 16827 NW Arizona Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | 03 /
RAHHAL-ORABI, Nadia 1894 NE Ashberry Drive Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US | 04 /
DOYLE, Brian 11156 NW Montreux Lane Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 05 /
SURI, Satyarth 476 NE Lenox Street Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US | 06 /
SIVAKUMAR, Swaminathan 12600 SW Crescent Street 406 Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 07 /
JONG, Lana 1822 NW 9th Avenue Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US | 08 /
SHA, Lin 5347 NW Skycrest Parkway Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09818322.1 | 28.09.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009US58540 | Priority number, date | US20080286338 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 286338 | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010039629 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2329524 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8242, H01L27/108, H01L21/027, H01L23/522, H01L49/02, H01G4/33, H01G4/012 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
H01G4/012 (EP,US);
H10B99/00 (KR);
H01L28/40 (EP,US);
H01G4/33 (EP,US);
H01L23/5223 (EP,US);
H01L28/90 (EP,US);
H10B12/00 (KR);
H10B12/033 (EP,US);
H01L28/91 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | H01L21/8242, H01L27/108, H01L21/027 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MUSTERUNG EINES METALLS AUF DER VERTIKALEN SEITENWAND EINER AUSGEHOBENEN STRUKTUR SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINES EINGEBETTETEN MIM-KONDENSATORS DAMIT UND DADURCH HERGESTELLTE EINGEBETTETE SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2011/23] | English: | METHOD OF PATTERNING A METAL ON A VERTICAL SIDEWALL OF AN EXCAVATED FEATURE, METHOD OF FORMING AN EMBEDDED MIM CAPACITOR USING SAME, AND EMBEDDED MEMORY DEVICE PRODUCED THEREBY | [2011/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAÇAGE DE MOTIF SUR UN MÉTAL SUR UNE PAROI LATÉRALE VERTICALE D UN ÉLÉMENT EXCAVÉ, PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D UN CONDENSATEUR MIM INCORPORÉ L UTILISANT, ET DISPOSITIF MÉMOIRE INCORPORÉ AINSI PRODUIT | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003013252 (HWANG JENG H [US], et al) [A] 1,4-8,11,12,15* paragraphs [0040] - [0074]; figure 4 *; | [XI]US2005106809 (SHEA KEVIN R [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0032] - [0055]; figures 2-11 * [I] 2-15; | [IA]US2006086952 (KIM HYUN-YOUNG [KR], et al) [I] 6-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0102]; figures 2-14 * [A] 1-5 | International search | [A]US6436787 (SHIH WONG-CHENG [TW], et al); | [A]US6670237 (LOH WYE BOON [SG], et al); | [A]KR20050006017 (RENESAS TECH CORP); | [X]US2005106809 (SHEA KEVIN R [US]) |