blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2350012 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2350012



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 865
03.05.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.06.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.05.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
12.05.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
12.05.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
03.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 86
03.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 86
11.01.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
23.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
23.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2016 Description Search / examination 1
23.12.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
08.09.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.09.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.09.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
08.09.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 86
08.09.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 86
04.08.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 80
04.08.2016 Description Search / examination 69
04.08.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
23.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
12.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
12.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
12.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
12.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
12.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
12.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
12.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
12.01.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
13.11.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
05.08.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
22.04.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
22.04.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
26.01.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
26.01.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
09.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
09.12.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
09.12.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
02.12.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.12.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.12.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.07.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
31.07.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.07.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
12.07.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
12.07.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
12.04.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
12.04.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
09.10.2012 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
21.09.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.09.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 8
21.09.2012 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 6
05.12.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
05.12.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
06.07.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.07.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.06.2011 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
29.04.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
28.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.04.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.04.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
18.02.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
10.09.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
10.09.2010 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
07.05.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
15.04.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 112