blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2350012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8729097Global Dossier 20.05.2014B2
US2011301163 08.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
US200913122876 06.10.2009
WO2009US05475 06.10.2009
US10291908 06.10.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2350012Global Dossier 28.06.2017B1
EP2350012 24.10.2012A4
EP2350012 03.08.2011A2
Priority number Date
WO2009US05475 06.10.2009
US10291908 06.10.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102239149B 13.05.2015B
CN102239149 09.11.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009US05475 06.10.2009
US10291908 06.10.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2641471T 10.11.2017T3
Priority number Date
WO2009US05475 06.10.2009
US10291908 06.10.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1163685 18.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2009US05475 06.10.2009
US10291908 06.10.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010042163Global Dossier 10.09.2010A3
WO2010042163 15.04.2010A2
Priority number Date
US10291908 06.10.2008