Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2350012

EP2350012 - QUINOLINE COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF ANGIOGENESIS, HUMAN METHIONINE AMINOPEPTIDASE, AND SIRT1, AND METHODS OF TREATING DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Johns Hopkins University
3400 N. Charles Street
Baltimore, MD 21218 / US
[2011/31]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Jun, O.
6909 Sandy Creek Court
Clarksville MD 21029 / US
02 / SHIM, Joong, Sup
4504 Lyons Run Circle Apt. 203
Owings Mills MD 21117 / US
03 / CHONG, Curtis, R.
501 St. Paul St. Apt. 304
Baltimore MD 21202 / US
04 / BHAT, Shridhar
8 Saddletop Ct.
Apartment D
Cockeysville MD 21030 / US
 [2017/26]
Former [2011/31]01 / LIU, Jun, O.
6909 Sandy Creek Court
Clarksville MD 21029 / US
02 / SHIM, Joong, Sup
4504 Lyons Run Circle Apt. 203
Owings Mills MD 21117 / US
03 / CHONG, Curtis, R.
501 St. Paul St. Apt. 304
Baltimore MD 21202 / US
04 / BHAT, Shridhar
8 Saddletop Ct. Apartment D
Cockeysville MD 21030 / US
Representative(s)Adam, Holger , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2017/26]
Former [2012/03]Adam, Holger , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2011/31]Adam, Holger
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date09819542.306.10.2009
[2011/31]
WO2009US05475
Priority number, dateUS20080102919P06.10.2008         Original published format: US 102919 P
[2011/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010042163
Date:15.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2350012
Date:03.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010
[2011/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2350012
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR10.09.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:C07D215/28, C07D215/04, A61K31/47, A61P35/00, C07D417/14
[2012/43]
Former International [2011/31]C07D215/28, C07D215/04, A61K31/47, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
Former [2011/31]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHINOLINVERBINDUNGEN ALS ANGIOGENESE-, HUMANE METHIONINAMINOPEPTIDASE- UND SIRT1-HEMMER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN[2011/31]
English:QUINOLINE COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF ANGIOGENESIS, HUMAN METHIONINE AMINOPEPTIDASE, AND SIRT1, AND METHODS OF TREATING DISORDERS[2011/31]
French:COMPOSÉS DE QUINOLINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE L'ANGIOGENÈSE, DE LA MÉTHIONINE AMINOPEPTIDASE HUMAINE ET DE LA SIRT1, ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES[2011/31]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2011National basic fee paid 
28.04.2011Search fee paid 
28.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/31]
12.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
22.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
12.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2017Fee for grant paid
12.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.07.2013
Opposition(s)29.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.10.2009
AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IE06.10.2017
LU06.10.2017
MT06.10.2017
IS28.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/45]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IE06.10.2017
LU06.10.2017
MT06.10.2017
IS28.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
LU06.10.2017
MT06.10.2017
IS28.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/39]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
LU06.10.2017
IS28.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/36]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
LU06.10.2017
IS28.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/35]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
LU06.10.2017
IS28.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/29]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2007086663  (UNIV SEOUL FOUNDATION OF IND A [KR]; PARK HYUNSUNG [KR]; CHOI SU MI [K) [X] 1-6,10-15 * page 5; example 7; claims 1,23-26; table 1 *;
 [X]WO2006117660  (CLIO PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US]; XILINAS MICHAEL [CY]) [X] 1-6,10-15 * example -; claims 1,11,15 *;
 [X]WO2008013966  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]; ZHANG YING [US]; ZHOU JIANGBING [US]; ZHANG H) [X] 1-6,10-15 * page 3; claims 1,7 *;
 [X]JPH0597674  (NIPPON MINING CO) [X] 1-6,10-15 * examples 1-3,5-10; claim 1 *;
 [X]US3351525  (ERNST HODEL) [X] 1-6,10,14,15 * example - *;
 [X]EP0254866  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,10,14,15 * page 2, line 30 - line 42; example 1 * * page 7 - page 51 *;
 [X]US5380852  (SCHUETZE RAINER [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-6,10,14,15 * column 4, line 20; claim -; table 1 *;
 [E]WO2009146546  (UNIV HEALTH NETWORK [CA]; SCHIMMER AARON D [CA]; LI XIAOMING [CA]; BAT) [E] 1-6,10-15 * claim -; table 1 *
 [X]  - DING WEI-QUN ET AL, "Anticancer activity of the antibiotic clioquinol", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20050401), vol. 65, no. 8, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-04-4385, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3389 - 3395, XP002371610 [X] 1-6,10-15 * page 3389 * * page 3394, column r *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-04-4385
 [X]  - MUSIOL ET AL, "Investigating biological activity spectrum for novel quinoline analogues", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, (20070119), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2006.11.020, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 1280 - 1288, XP005823069 [X] 1-6,10-15 * page 1284; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2006.11.020
 [T]  - SHRIDHAR BHAT ET AL, "Substituted oxines inhibit endothelial cell proliferation and angiogenesis", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (20120101), vol. 10, no. 15, doi:10.1039/c2ob06978d, ISSN 1477-0520, page 2979, XP055037778 [T] * page 2987 - page 2988; figure 2; example - *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c2ob06978d
 [X]  - UNGUREANU M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF NEW ANTIBACTERIAN AND ANTIFUNGAL DERIVATIVES OF 8-HYDROXYQUINOLINE", ANALELE STIINTIFICE ALE UNIVERSITATII AL. I. CUZA DIN IASI,SECTIUNEA 1C: CHIMIE, UNIVERSITATEA AL. I. CUZA: CARTIMEX, IASI, RO, (19990101), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 0041-9117, pages 55 - 60, XP001053040 [X] 1-6,10-15 * page 55; example -; table 1 *
International search[X]WO0116108  (LIGAND PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED ET AL.);
 [X]WO0200625  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG);
 [A]WO9619458  (LIGAND PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED);
 [A]US4758264  (HUBELE; ADOLF);
 [A]WO2004103998  (GLAXO GROUP LIMITED ET AL.)
Examination   - "Collagenases in Human Breast Carcinoma Cell Lines", CANCER RES, (19860101), page 1349, XP055072506
    - C. PELLETIER ET AL, "Roles of divalent cations and pH in mechanism of action of nitroxoline against Escherichia coli strains", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (19950301), vol. 39, no. 3, doi:10.1128/AAC.39.3.707, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 707 - 713, XP055072467

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.39.3.707
    - Chelation therapy for non-overload conditions, United Healthcare services, Inc., (20150105), vol. CS016.C, pages 1 - 9
    - NASULEWICZ A, "Role of copper in tumour angiogenesis-clinical implications", JOURNAL OF TRACE ELEMENTS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jtemb.2004.02.004, pages 1 - 8, XP004957282

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jtemb.2004.02.004
    - TREIBER C, "Clioquonol mediates copper uptake and counteracts copper efflux activities of the amyloid precursor protein of Alzehimer's disease", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20040930), vol. 279, no. 50, pages 51958 - 51964
    - FILIZ G, "The role of metals in modulating metalloprotease activity in the AD brain", EUR BIOPHYS J, (20080213), vol. 37, pages 315 - 321, XP019586211
    - RODRIGUEZ-MANZANEQUE J C, "Thrombospondin-1 suppresses spontaneous tumor growth", PNAS, (20010830), vol. 98, no. 22, pages 12485 - 12490
by applicantUS3870790
 US4226859
 US4369172
 US4842866
 US5705190
 US6638534
 US5541171
 US5217720
 US6569457
    - CHANG, Y. H. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 8007 - 8011
    - LI, X.; CHANG, Y. H., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U. S. A, (1995), vol. 92, pages 12357 - 12361
    - BOXEM, M. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2004), vol. 576, pages 245 - 250
    - CUTFORTH, T.; GAUL, U., MECH. DEV., (1999), vol. 82, pages 23 - 28
    - GRIFFITH, E. C. ET AL., CHEM. BIOL., (1997), vol. 4, pages 461 - 471
    - SIN, N. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (1997), vol. 94, pages 6099 - 6103
    - INGBER, D. ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 555 - 557
    - SATCHI-FAINARO, R. ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2005), vol. 7, pages 251 - 261
    - YEH, J. R. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (2006), vol. 103, pages 10379 - 10384
    - FOLKMAN, J., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1971), vol. 285, pages 1182 - 1186
    - HANAHAN, D.; FOLKMAN, J., CELL, (1996), vol. 86, pages 353 - 364
    - FOLKMAN, J.; KLAGSBRUN, M., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 235, pages 442 - 447
    - CARMELIET, P., NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, pages 653 - 660
    - S. M. BERGE ET AL., J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19
    - CURTIS, R. C. ET AL., ACS CHEM. BIOL., (2007), vol. 2, pages 263 - 270
    - ZHANG, Y. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (2000), vol. 97, pages 6427 - 6432
    - YEH, J. R. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2000), vol. 97, pages 12782 - 12787
    - NORTH, B. J. ET AL., MOL. CELL, (2003), vol. 11, pages 437 - 444
    - LAIN, S. ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2008), vol. 13, pages 454 - 463
    - OTA, H. ET AL., J MOL CELL CARDIOL., (2007), vol. 43, pages 571 - 579
    - POTENTE, M. ET AL., GENES DEV., (2007), vol. 21, pages 2644 - 2658
    - ALEXANDER, J. ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 31, pages 318 - 322
    - BUNDGAARD, H., Design of Prodrugs, ELSEVIER, (1985), pages 1 - 92
    - BUNDGAARD, H.; NIELSEN, N. M., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 30, pages 451 - 454
    - BUNDGAARD, H. A, Textbook of Drug Design and Development, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBL., (1991), pages 113 - 191
    - DIGENIS, G. A. ET AL., Handbook of Experimental Pharmacology, (1975), vol. 28, pages 86 - 112
    - FRIIS, G. J.; BUNDGAARD, H., A Textbook of Drug Design and Development, OVERSEAS PUBL., (1996), pages 351 - 385
    - PITMAN, I. H., MEDICINAL RESEARCH REVIEWS, (1981), vol. 1, pages 189 - 214
    - HU, X. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2006), vol. 103, pages 18148 - 18153