EP2346637 - CUTTING TAP AND METHOD OF MAKING A CUTTING TAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/30] | CUTTING TAP AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | ||
[2015/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [2015/35] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Kennametal Inc. 1600 Technology Way P.O. Box 231 Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERER, Willard, E. 745 Magruder Landing Evans, Georgia 30809 / US | 02 /
GEORGE, Stephen, M. 5204 Forest Oaks Drive Greensboro, NC 27406 / US | 03 /
VOLOKH, Vladimir, D. 21 Havazelet 24952 Maalot / IL | [2011/33] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
HENDERER, Willard, E. 745 Magruder Landing Evans, Georgia 30809 / US | ||
02 /
GEORGE, Stephen, M. 1206 Ventana Court Evans, Georgia 30809 / US | |||
03 /
VOLOKH, Vladimir, D. 21 Havazelet 24952 Maalot / IL | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2011/30] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09821013.1 | 05.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009US59524 | Priority number, date | US20080250570 | 14.10.2008 Original published format: US 250570 | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010045054 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2346637 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2346637 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23G5/06, B23P15/52, B24B3/18, B24B19/04 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
B23G5/06 (EP,KR,US);
B23G5/00 (KR);
B23P15/52 (EP,KR,US);
B24B19/04 (EP,US);
B24B3/18 (EP,US);
B23G2200/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/30] | B23G5/06, B23G5/00, B23P15/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2011/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWINDESCHNEIDER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES GEWINDESCHNEIDERS | [2015/15] | English: | CUTTING TAP AND METHOD OF MAKING A CUTTING TAP | [2015/15] | French: | TARAUD ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TARAUD | [2015/15] |
Former [2011/30] | GEWINDESCHNEIDER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2011/30] | CUTTING TAP AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | ||
Former [2011/30] | TARAUD ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 03.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2009 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MK | 26.08.2015 | MT | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | SM | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | IE | 05.10.2015 | LU | 05.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | GB | 26.11.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 05.10.2009 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 05.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
GB | 26.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 05.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
GB | 26.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 05.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
GB | 26.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 05.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.10.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1447700 (WELLS FRANK O) [A] 6,12* figures 1,4 *; | [I]DE518152 (ALBERT STRASMANN FA) [I] 1,4 * figures 1-5 * * the whole document *; | [I]FR701232 (PUTENSEN JEAN [FR]) [I] 1,4 * figures 1,2 * * the whole document *; | [Y]SU730503 (MI SP K B AVTOMAT [SU]) [Y] 6,12 * figures 1-3 *; | [I]JPS59196120 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO, et al) [I] 1,4,5 * figures 1,3,12 * * abstract *; | [I]FR2739314 (OUTILLAGE ARMOR [FR]) [I] 1,4 * figures 1-3 * * the whole document *; | [I]JP2004001103 (YAMAWA MFG) [I] 1 * figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [I]EP1902805 (GLIMPEL EMUGE WERK [DE]) [I] 1,4,7,8 * figures 3,4 * * abstract *; | [IY]US2008095587 (HENDERER WILLARD E [US], et al) [I] 1,4,7-11 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0050] - [0054] * * the whole document * [Y] 6,12 | International search | [A]JPS59196120 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO, et al); | [Y]JP2004001103 (YAMAWA MFG); | [A]US2005271486 (HENDERER WILLARD E [US], et al); | [Y]US2008095587 (HENDERER WILLARD E [US], et al); | [A]US2008095588 (HENDERER WILLARD E [US], et al) | Examination | US3347114 | by applicant | US2008095587 |