EP2363466 - TANNASE, GENE ENCODING SAME, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amano Enzyme Inc. 2-7 Nishiki 1-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-8630 / JP | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Megumi c/o Gifu R&D Center AMANO ENZYME INC. 1-6, Technoplaza Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 509-0109 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Naoki c/o Gifu R&D Center AMANO ENZYME INC. 1-6, Technoplaza Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 509-0109 / JP | 03 /
AMANO, Hitoshi c/o Gifu R&D Center AMANO ENZYME INC. 1-6, Technoplaza Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 509-0109 / JP | 04 /
YAMAGUCHI, Shotaro c/o Gifu R&D Center AMANO ENZYME INC. 1-6, Technoplaza Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 509-0109 / JP | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Steinecke, Peter Müller Fottner Steinecke Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Römerstrasse 16 b 52428 Jülich / DE | [2017/18] |
Former [2011/36] | Steinecke, Peter Müller Fottner Steinecke Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Technologiezentrum Jülich Karl-Heinz-Beckurts-Strasse 13 52428 Jülich / DE | Application number, filing date | 09821747.4 | 02.10.2009 | [2017/18] | WO2009JP05105 | Priority number, date | JP20080274360 | 24.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008274360 | [2011/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010047047 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2363466 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2363466 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N9/18, C12P7/40 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
C12N9/18 (EP,US);
C12P7/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TANNASE, DAFÜR KODIERENDES GEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/02] | English: | TANNASE, GENE ENCODING SAME, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2011/36] | French: | TANNASE, GÈNE LA CODANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ | [2011/36] |
Former [2011/36] | TANNASE, DAFÜR CODIERENDES GEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2011 | Translation filed | 18.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 30.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2009 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | IT | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | IE | 02.10.2017 | LU | 02.10.2017 | MT | 02.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 02.10.2017 | ||
LU | 02.10.2017 | ||
MT | 02.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 02.10.2017 | ||
LU | 02.10.2017 | ||
MT | 02.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 02.10.2017 | ||
LU | 02.10.2017 | ||
MT | 02.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 02.10.2017 | ||
LU | 02.10.2017 | ||
MT | 02.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 02.10.2017 | ||
LU | 02.10.2017 | ||
MT | 02.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 02.10.2017 | ||
MT | 02.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 02.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 02.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BANERJEE DEBDULAL ET AL, "Production and characterization of extracellular and intracellular tannase from newly isolated Aspergillus aculeatus DBF 9", JOURNAL OF BASIC MICROBIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 41, no. 6, ISSN 0233-111X, pages 313 - 318, XP002678234 [X] 1,2,4,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4028(200112)41:6<313::AID-JOBM313>3.0.CO;2-W | [X] - AGUILAR CRISTOBAL N ET AL, "Microbial tannases: advances and perspectives", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, vol. 76, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00253-007-1000-2, ISSN 0175-7598, (20070801), pages 47 - 59, (20070526), XP002524577 [X] 1 * page 54, column 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00253-007-1000-2 | International search | [X]WO03012071 (ELITRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [X]JP2003250588 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL, et al); | [X]JPS4835478B (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.); | [X] - ROBERT, W-J. ET AL., "Tannase from Aspergillus awamori: Purification, characterization, and the elucidation of the role of tannins in lowering in vitro protein digestibility of black beans", DISS. ABSTR. INT. B, (1989), vol. 50, no. 7, page 2902, XP009160346 | [X] - SHARMA, S. ET AL., "Isolation, purification and properties of tannase from Aspergillus niger van Tieghem", WORLD J. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 673 - 677, XP008148974 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S11274-011-0992-Z | [X] - DHAR, S.C ET AL., "Purification, crystallisation and physico-chemical properties of tannase of aspergillus niger", LEATHER SCIENCE, (1964), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 27 - 38 | [X] - PEL, H.J. ET AL., "unnamed protein product [Aspergillus niger]", GENBANK, (20070324), Database accession no. CAK38707.1, URL: AM270075.1, XP008148984 | [X] - RAMIREZ-CORONEL, M.A. ET AL., "A novel tannase from Aspergillus niger with beta-glucosidase activity", MICROBIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 149, pages 2941 - 2946, XP008148985 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.26346-0 | [X] - MAHAPATRA, K. ET AL., "Purification, characterization and some studies on secondary structure of tannase from Aspergillus awamori nakazawa", PROCESS BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 40, pages 3251 - 3254, XP027794029 | [A] - BATRA, A. ET AL., "Potential tannase producers from the genera Aspergillus and Penicillium", PROCESS BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 40, pages 1553 - 1557, XP027793802 | [A] - PEL, H.J. ET AL., "Genome sequencing and analysis of the versatile cell factory Aspergillus niger CBS 513.88", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 221 - 231, XP002458027 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1282 | Examination | - NAGAI MASARU ET AL, "Purification and characterization of an endo-polygalacturonase from Aspergillus awamori", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPAN SOCIETY FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND AGROCHEMISTRY, TOKYO, JAPAN, (20000801), vol. 64, no. 8, doi:10.1271/BBB.64.1729, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 1729 - 1732, XP002471742 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.64.1729 | - Satoshi Kaneko ET AL, "Purification and Substrate Specificities of Two [alpha]-l-Arabinofuranosidases from Aspergillus awamori IFO 4033", Applied and Environmental Microbiology, UNITED STATES, (19981001), pages 4021 - 4027, URL: http://aem.asm.org/content/64/10/4021.full.pdf, (20160330), XP055261455 | by applicant | JPH0880196 | JP2003250588 | JPH07289262 | JPH0870874 | JPH08140685 | US5512463 | WO9802535 | JP2003319786 | - APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 76, pages 47 - 59 | - GENE, (1996), vol. 175, pages 215 - 221 | - MICROBIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 149, pages 2941 - 2946 | - PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, (200504), vol. 40, no. 5, pages 1553 - 1557 | - KARLIN, ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 68 | - KARLIN, ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 77 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., AMINO ACIDS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, no. 17, pages 3389 - 3402 | - MEYERS, MILLER, COMPUT. APPL. BIOSCI., (1988), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - Molecular Cloning, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS | - GENE, (1987), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 115 - 127 | - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1981), vol. 256, pages 7990 - 7997 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1982), vol. 79, pages 1408 - 1412 | - GENE, (1988), vol. 64, pages 313 - 319 | - ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 224, pages 347 - 353 | - NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, no. 24, pages 9441 - 9456 | - ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 200, pages 81 - 88 | - GENE, (1991), vol. 102, pages 67 - 70 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1985), vol. 82, pages 488 - 492 | - GENE, (1995), vol. 152, pages 271 - 275 | - GENE, (1991), vol. 103, pages 73 - 77 | - POTTER, H. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1984), vol. 81, pages 7161 - 7165 | - FELGNER, P.L. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1984), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7417 | - GRAESSMANN, M., GRAESSMANN, A., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1976), vol. 73, pages 366 - 370 | - HANAHAN, D., J. MOL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 166, pages 557 - 580 | - SCHIESTL, R.H. ET AL., CURR. GENET., (1989), vol. 16, pages 339 - 346 | - YELTON, M.M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1984), vol. 81, pages 1470 - 1474 | - DESCHAMPS, J. FERMENT. TECHNOL., (1983), vol. 61, no. 1, pages 55 - 59 | - SHARMA, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 279, pages 85 - 89 | - SAITO, MIURA, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1963), vol. 72, pages 619 - 629 | - MOL. GEN. GENET., (1997), vol. 253, pages 520 - 528 | - MOL. GEN. GENET., (1989), vol. 218, pages 99 - 104 |