Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2350838

EP2350838 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2011/31]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ABE, KOICHI
C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2011/31]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/31]Garner, Jonathan Charles Stapleton
Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
Application number, filing date09821783.920.10.2009
[2011/31]
WO2009JP05469
Priority number, dateJP2008027104521.10.2008         Original published format: JP 2008271045
JP2009015147725.06.2009         Original published format: JP 2009151477
[2011/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010047083
Date:29.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2350838
Date:03.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010
[2011/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.04.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/00, G06F3/048, G06F3/12, G03G15/00
[2012/49]
Former International [2011/31]G06F13/00, G06F3/048, G06F3/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/31]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2011/31]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2011/31]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, ET PROGRAMME ASSOCIE[2011/31]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2011National basic fee paid 
23.05.2011Search fee paid 
23.05.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/31]
08.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
13.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.07.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination17.09.2015Appeal received No.  T2228/15
18.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2014
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
13.09.2013Request for further processing filed
13.09.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.09.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
31.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1460529  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [I] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0228022  (PALM INC [US]) [A] 1-30 * page 28, line 10 - page 37, line 2 * * figures 7A, 7B, 8 *
International search[Y]JP2008168600  (CANON KK);
 [Y]JP2006185251  (CANON MARKETING JAPAN INC);
 [Y]JP2003150469  (CANON KK);
 [A]WO0141099  (SILVERBROOK RES PTY LTD [AU], et al);
 [A]JP2001028597  (CANON KK);
 [A]JP2001007824  (HITACHI LTD)
by applicantEP1460529