Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2341974

EP2341974 - A CATHETER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.07.2015
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cathrx Ltd
ACN 089 310 421 5 Parkview Drive
Homebush Bay, NSW 2127 / AU
[2011/28]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSON, Neil, Lawrence
95 Macquarie Street
Roseville NSW 2069 / AU
02 / CHONG, Evan
21 James Street
South Strathfield NSW 2136 / AU
03 / OGLE, David
1190 Pacific Highway
Cowan NSW 2081 / AU
04 / PANOS, James
35 Hincks Street
Kingsford NSW 2032 / AU
 [2011/28]
Representative(s)Fleuchaus, Michael A. , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinerstraße 15/Haus A
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]Fleuchaus, Michael A. , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Steinerstrasse 15/A
81369 München / DE
Former [2011/28]Fleuchaus, Michael A. , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Straße 36
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date09822903.230.10.2009
[2011/28]
WO2009AU01421
Priority number, dateUS20080110522P31.10.2008         Original published format: US 110522 P
[2011/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010048676
Date:06.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2341974
Date:13.07.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010
[2011/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2341974
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU06.05.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/04, A61B18/14, A61M25/01, A61M25/00
[2012/14]
Former International [2011/28]A61M25/04, A61B18/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATHETERANORDNUNG[2011/28]
English:A CATHETER ASSEMBLY[2011/28]
French:ENSEMBLE CATHETER[2014/28]
Former [2011/28]ENSEMBLE CATHÉTER
Entry into regional phase31.05.2011National basic fee paid 
31.05.2011Search fee paid 
31.05.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/28]
27.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2014Fee for grant paid
30.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2013
Opposition(s)11.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.10.2009
AT10.09.2014
BE10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
MK10.09.2014
MT10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
TR10.09.2014
IE30.10.2014
LU30.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU30.10.2009
AT10.09.2014
BE10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
MT10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
TR10.09.2014
IE30.10.2014
LU30.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2016/32]HU30.10.2009
AT10.09.2014
BE10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
TR10.09.2014
IE30.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2016/28]AT10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
IE30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2016/22]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
SM10.09.2014
IE30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/50]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
IE30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/46]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
IE30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/34]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/33]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/32]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
BE31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/30]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
BE31.10.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
HR10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
GR11.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
NO10.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT10.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP1419743  (BIOSENSE WEBSTER INC) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-9,14 [I] 2,10-13,15,16,19-24;
 [X]US2005070887  (BOSTON SCIENTIFIC SCIMED INC) [X] 1,17,18 * paragraphs [0042] , [0073]; figure 12 *;
 [Y]US2002177765  (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC) [Y] 3-7 * paragraph [0065]; figure 8 *;
 [Y]WO2005070491  (CATHRX PTY LTD) [Y] 8,9,14 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 17; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2004028233  (EPICOR MEDICAL INC) [A] 1-24 * page 20; figure 2D *
International search[X]US6771996  (BOWE WADE A [US], et al);
 [X]WO2005070491  (CATHRX PTY LTD [AU], et al);
 [X]US6391018  (TANAKA NOBUHIKO [JP], et al);
 [X]US2004039371  (TOCKMAN BRUCE [US], et al);
 [X]US2008015409  (BARLOW DAVID E [US], et al);
 [X]WO2006135988  (CATHRX LTD [AU], et al);
 [X]US2002004644  (KOBLISH JOSEF V [US]);
 [X]US5100423  (FEARNOT NEAL E [US]);
 [X]WO0245608  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]);
 [X]WO2004100813  (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO0232497  (ADVANCED METAL COATINGS PTY LT [AU], et al)
by applicantEP1419743
 US2005070887
 US2002177765
 WO2005070491