Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2349302

EP2349302 - CARDIOPROTECTIVE EFFECTS OF NUTRACEUTICALS ISOLATED FROM NIGELLA SATIVA SEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.2016
Database last updated on 15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.02.2016  [2016/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universiti Putra Malaysia
UPM Serdang
43400 Selangor Darul Ehsan / MY
[2011/31]
Inventor(s)01 / ISMAIL, Maznah
Universiti Putra Malaysia UPM Serdang
43400 Selangor Darul Ehsan / MY
02 / AL-NAQEEB, Ghanya
Universiti Putra Malaysia UPM Serdang
43400 Selangor Darul Ehsan / MY
 [2011/31]
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstrasse 58
80636 München / DE
[2011/31]
Application number, filing date09823872.807.08.2009
[2011/31]
WO2009MY00114
Priority number, dateMY2008000428528.10.2008         Original published format: MY 0804285
[2011/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010050794
Date:06.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2349302
Date:03.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010
[2011/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.05.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/71, A61P9/00, A61P39/06, A61K9/14, A61K9/107
[2011/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/31]
TitleGerman:KARDIOPROTEKTIVE WIRKUNGEN VON NUTRAZEUTIKA, DIE AUS SAMEN VON NIGELLA SATIVA ISOLIERT WURDEN[2011/31]
English:CARDIOPROTECTIVE EFFECTS OF NUTRACEUTICALS ISOLATED FROM NIGELLA SATIVA SEEDS[2011/31]
French:EFFETS CARDIOPROTECTEURS DE NUTRACEUTIQUES ISOLÉS DE GRAINES DE NIGELLA NATIVA[2011/31]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2011National basic fee paid 
11.05.2011Search fee paid 
11.05.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
11.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/31]
12.01.2012Observations by third parties
18.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/07]
12.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.11.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2003060454  (KANDIL OSAMA [US]) [Y] 1-7 * page 3, paragraph 30 *;
 [X]  - MACHMUDAH ET AL, "Extraction of Nigella sativa L. using supercritical CO2: A study of antioxidant activity of the extract", SEPARATION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, DEKKER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20050101), vol. 40, no. 6, ISSN 0149-6395, pages 1267 - 1275, XP009151838 [X] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [X]  - RAO ET AL, "Comparative evaluation of SFE and solvent extraction methods on the yield and composition of black seeds (Nigella Sativa)", JOURNAL OF LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES, MONTICELLO, NY, US, (20070101), vol. 30, no. 17, ISSN 1082-6076, pages 2545 - 2555, XP009151837 [X] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - EL TAHIR K E H ET AL, "The cardiovascular actions of the volatile oil of the black seed (Nigella sativa) in rats: elucidation of the mechanism of action", GENERAL PHARMACOLOGY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 24, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0306-3623(93)90359-6, ISSN 0306-3623, (19930901), pages 1123 - 1131, (19930901), XP023833483 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-3623(93)90359-6
 [Y]  - ALI B H ET AL, "Pharmacological and toxicological properties of Nigella sativa", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, GB, (20030101), vol. 17, no. 4, doi:10.1002/PTR.1309, ISSN 0951-418X, pages 299 - 305, XP002538026 [Y] 1-7 * pages 300,303 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/PTR.1309
 [Y]  - BAMOSA A O ET AL, "The effect of thymoquinone on blood lipids in rats", INDIAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY 2002 IN, (2002), vol. 46, no. 2, ISSN 0019-5499, pages 195 - 201, XP009160550 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - MANSOUR MAHMOUD A ET AL, "Effects of thymoquinone on antioxidant enzyme activities, lipid peroxidation and DT-diaphorase in different tissues of mice: A possible mechanism of action", CELL BIOCHEMISTRY AND FUNCTION, (200206), vol. 20, no. 2, ISSN 0263-6484, pages 143 - 151, XP009160570 [Y] 1-7 * figures 1-7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbf.968
International search[X]WO2005009332
 [Y]US2003060454
 [A]WO0032211
 [A]US6218434
 [X]  DAHRI AH ET AL., "Effect of Nigella Sativa (Kalonji) on serum cholesterol of albino rats", J AYUB MED COLL ABBOTTABAD., (200504), vol. 17, no. 2, PAGE 72 - 74, XP008147312 [X]
 [X]  EL TAHIR KAMAL E. H. ET AL., "The cardiovascular actions of the volative oil of the black seed (Nigella sativa) in rats: elucidation of the mechanism of action", GEN. PHARMAC., (1993), vol. 24, no. 5, PAGE 1123 - 1131, XP023833483 [X]

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-3623(93)90359-6
 [Y]  MACHMUDAH SITI ET AL., "Extraction of Nigella sativa L. using Supercritical CO2: A Study of Antioxidant activity of the Extract", SEPARATION SCI&TEC, (2005), vol. 40, no. 6, PAGE 1267 - 1275, XP009151838 [Y]
 [A]  AL-ALI A ET AL., "Oral and intraperitoneal LD50 of thymoquinone, an active principle of Nigella sativa, in mice and rats", J AYUB MED COLL ABBOTTABAD., (200804), vol. 20, no. 2, PAGE 25 - 27, XP008147313 [A]
other   - "Vacadicurnam (03)", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS/1594, XP003029194
    - Bharata Bhaisajya Ratnakara, vol. IV, page 586,
    - "Vacadhya Avaleha", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. VK1/638, XP003029195
    - BASAVARAJA, Basavarajiyam, page 250,
    - "Jirakatritayama Gunah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS6/1214, XP003024388
    - KAIYADEVA, Kaiyadevanighantau, page 219,
    - "Suksmailadi Curna", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RG9/12, XP003024389
    - SODHALA, Sodhalanighantauh, page 3,
    - "Majoon Laboob", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/4621, XP003029196
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, page 716,