Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2347119

EP2347119 - FLOAT FOR WAVE ENERGY CONVERTER (WEC) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2018New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ocean Power Technologies, Inc.
28 Engelhard Drive, Suite B
Monroe Township, NJ 08831 / US
[2018/37]
Former [2011/30]For all designated states
Ocean Power Technologies, Inc.
1590 Reed Road
Pennington, NJ 08534 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GERBER, James, S.
1003 Goodrich Ave.
Saint Paul MN 55105 / US
02 / PHELAN, Christopher, T.
1010 N. Randolph Street
Philadelphia PA 19123 / US
03 / QIU, Wei
24 Baker St.
St. Johns, NL A1A5A8 / CA
04 / SPENCER, Donald, Smith
16 Browns Lane
Torbay Nl A1K1J1 / CA
 [2011/30]
Representative(s)Loven, Keith James , et al
LOVEN Patents & Trademarks Limited
51 Wragby Road
Sudbrooke
Lincoln, Lincolnshire LN2 2QU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/16]Loven, Keith James , et al
LOVEN Patents & Trademarks Limited
3 Checkpoint Court
Lincoln LN6 3PW / GB
Former [2011/32]Loven, Keith James
Loven Patents & Trademarks West Central Runcorn Road
Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB
Former [2011/30]Larcher, Dominique
Cabinet Vidon, 16 B, rue Jouanet, BP 90333 Technopole Atalante
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
Application number, filing date09827864.119.11.2009
[2011/30]
WO2009US06184
Priority number, dateUS20080199881P21.11.2008         Original published format: US 199881 P
[2011/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010059209
Date:27.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2347119
Date:27.07.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010
[2011/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.07.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:F03B13/14, F03B13/18, E02B9/08
[2017/40]
Former International [2011/30]F03B13/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/30]
TitleGerman:SCHWIMMER FÜR EINEN WELLENENERGIEWANDLER[2011/30]
English:FLOAT FOR WAVE ENERGY CONVERTER (WEC)[2011/30]
French:FLOTTEUR POUR CONVERTISSEUR D ÉNERGIE HOULOMOTRICE (WEC)[2011/30]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2011National basic fee paid 
15.06.2011Search fee paid 
15.06.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/30]
28.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2007068153  (GERBER JAMES S [US]) [I] 1,2,7,8,11 * abstract * [Y] 3-6,9,10,12-14;
 [Y]US5188550  (OLIVER WYNN W [US]) [Y] 3,4,6,9,10,12-14 * abstract *;
 [Y]US612549  (H. E. RIDER) [Y] 3-6,9,10,12-14 * abstract *
International search[Y]US2007266704  (BULL DIANA [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007266921  (BRADY PETER [AU]);
 [Y]US5975865  (MANABE YASUHIRO [JP]);
 [A]US5986349  (EBERLE WILLIAM J [US]);
 [A]US4631921  (LINDERFELT HAL R [US]);
 [A]US1502511  (MARVIN FREDERICK B);
 [A]US997731  (AYERS EDWARD L [CA]);
 [A]US884080  (FALLIS GEORGE T [US]);
 [A]US321229  (LEAVITT);
 [A]US3507239  (WIPKINK JOHANNES, et al);
 [A]US3361104  (GLASS JOHN P)
 [Y]  - BACKER, "WAVE ENERGY EXTRACTION IN THE SOUTHERN NORTH SEA BY A HEAVING POINT ABSORBER", 1st International PhD Symposium on Offshore Renewable Energy [online], (200706), page 55, XP008145885
 [A]  - "Guidelines on design and operation of wave energy converters", REPORT FOR CARBON TRUST AND CARRIED OUT BY DET NORSKE VERITAS, MAY 2005, (200505), URL: http://www.dnv.com/binaries/WECguideline_ tcm4-270406.pdf, (20100203), XP008145884
by applicantUS2007068153
 US5188550