Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2512444

EP2512444 - MIXTURES OF PLANTS IN SPAGYRIC MOTHER TINCTURE FOR DRY COUGH IN BABIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marzano Ancora, Monica
Via Zorzi 36
6500 Bellinzona / CH
[2012/43]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/43]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/43]
Application number, filing date09828425.017.12.2009
[2017/12]
WO2009IB07821
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010067199
Date:17.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2512444
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010
[2012/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2512444
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/02, A61K41/00, A61K35/64, A61K36/17, A61K36/185, A61K36/24, A61K36/35, A61K36/42, A61K36/53, A61K36/71, A61K36/736, A61K36/81
[2012/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/43]
TitleGerman:PFLANZENGEMISCHE IN EINER SPAGYRISCHEN URTINKTUR GEGEN TROCKENEN HUSTEN VON BABYS[2012/43]
English:MIXTURES OF PLANTS IN SPAGYRIC MOTHER TINCTURE FOR DRY COUGH IN BABIES[2012/43]
French:MELANGES DE PLANTES DANS UNE TEINTURE-MERE SPAGYRIQUE CONTRE LA TOUX SECHE CHEZ LES BEBES[2012/43]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2011National basic fee paid 
14.09.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
15.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/43]
11.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2013Observations by third parties
17.09.2013Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
10.12.2013Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
20.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
01.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
30.09.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2016Observations by third parties
03.02.2017Fee for grant paid
03.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2014
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
14.09.2011Request for further processing filed
14.09.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.04.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
16.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
09.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201204   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2013
31.12.201305   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2014
31.12.201507   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.2016
31.12.201608   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.2017
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.12.2009
CY22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MK22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
MT17.12.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU17.12.2009
CY22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
MT17.12.2017
Former [2019/31]HU17.12.2009
EE22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
MT17.12.2017
Former [2018/43]EE22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
MT17.12.2017
Former [2017/51]EE22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/49]EE22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/41]LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]CN1290538  ;
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 43, Database accession no. 2001-399065, XP002618347 & CN1290538 A 20010411 (WAN D) [Y] 1-29 * abstract *
 [Y]  - "Suppositorien, Vaginalzubereitungen, Stifte", Bauer, Frömming, Führer (Eds), Pharmazeutische Technologie, Stuttgart, Georg Thieme Verlag, (1993), vol. 4, pages 272 - 277, Chapter 13, ISBN 3-13-692504-1, XP002618348 [Y] 1-29 * pages 272-274, paragraph 1 *
 [Y]  - "Homöopatische Zubereitungen und Darreichungsformen", Bauer, Frömming, Führer (Eds), Pharmazeutische Technologie, Stuttgart, Georg Thieme Verlag, (1993), vol. 4, pages 382 - 388, Chapter 19, ISBN 3-13-692504-1, XP002618349 [Y] 1-29 * page 386, column r, paragraph 7 * * page 387, column r, paragraphs 4-6 *
 [Y]  - J. Tukker, "Rectal and vaginal drug delivery", J. Tukker, M.E. Aulton (Ed), Pharmaceutics. The science of dosage form design, Edinburgh, Churchill Livingstone, (2002), vol. 2, pages 534 - 543, Chapter 34, ISBN 0443055173, XP002618350 [Y] 1-29 * pages 537-538 *
ExaminationCN1739645
 US6541045
    - SCHELLERER S, "DEM SCHNUPFEN EIN SCHNIPPCHEN SCHLAGEN", PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZEITUNG, GOVI VERLAG, ESCHBORN, DE, (20030911), vol. 148, no. 37, ISSN 0031-7136, pages 16 - 25, XP001247323
by applicant   - DE BOER, A. G.; MOOLENAAR, F.; DE LEEDE, J.; BREIMER, D. D., "Rectal drug administration: clinical pharmacokinetic considerations", CLINICAL PHARMACOKINETICS, (1982), vol. 7, pages 285 - 311, XP009041484
    - VAN HOOGDALEM, E. J.; DE BOER, A. G.; BREIMER, D. D., "Pharmacokinetics of rectal drug administration. Part 1. General considerations and clinical applications of centrally acting drugs", CLINICAL PHARMACOKINETICS, (1991), vol. 21, pages 11 - 26
    - MOES, A., "Biodisponibilit6 des formes d' administration rectale", SCIENCE AND TECHNICAL PHARMACEUTICS, (1980), vol. 9, pages 263 - 88
    - HENRICH, M., "Clinical topography of the proctodeum", ACTA ANATOMICA, (1980), vol. 106, pages 161 - 70
    - SIMANOWSKI, U. A.; SUTER, P.; RUSSEL, R. M.; HELLER, M.; WALDHERR, R.; WARD, R. ET AL., "Enhancement of ethanol induced rectal mucosal hyper-regeneration with age in F344 rats", GUT, (1994), vol. 35, pages 1102 - 6
    - KAKEMI, K.; ARITA, T.; MURANISHI, S., "Absorption and excretion of drugs. XXV. On the mechanism of rectal absorption of sulfonamides", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (1965), vol. 13, pages 861 - 9
    - BAHIA, M. F., "Absorption of some cephalosporins by rectal route in rabbits", BOLLETTINO CHIMICO FARMACEUTICO, (1991), vol. 130, pages 128 - 32
    - NISHIMURA, K. I.; NOZAKI, Y.; YOSHIMI, A.; NAKAMURA, S.; KITAGAWA, M.; KAKEYA, N. ET AL., "Studies, on the promoting effects of carboxylic acid derivatives on the rectal absorption of H-tactam antibiotics in rats", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (1985), vol. 33, pages 282 - 91
    - MATSUMOTO, Y.; WATANABE, Y.; TOJIMA, T.; MURAKOSHI, R.; MURAKAWI, C.; MATSUMOTO, M., "Rectal absorption enhancement of gentamicin in rabbits from hollow type suppositories by sodium salicylate or sodium caprylate", DRUG DESIGN AND. DELIVERY, (1989), vol. 4, pages 247 - 56
    - YATA, N.; HIGASHI, Y.; MURAKAMI, T.; YAMAJO, R.; WU, W.M.; TAKU, K. ET AL., "A possible mechanism of absorption promoters", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOBIODYNAMICS, (1983), vol. 6, page 78
    - NISHIHATA, T.; RYTTING, J. H.; HIGUCHI, T.; CALDWELL, L. J.; SELK, S. J., "Enhancement of rectal absorption of water-soluble antibiotics in dogs", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (1984), vol. 21, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-5173(84)90098-X, pages 239 - 48, XP023844898

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(84)90098-X
    - KAKEYA, N., "Development of new adjuvants for enhanced rectal absorption", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 14TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF CHEMOTHERAPY, (1985), page 2711
    - KAWASHIMA, S.; NISHIURA, N.; NOGUCHI, T.; FUJIWARA, H., "Studies on sustained-release suppositories. Effect of alginic acid addition on rectal absorption of bacampicillin in rabbits", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (1989), vol. 37, pages 766 - 70
    - NAKANISHI, K.; MASUKAWA, T.; MASADA, M.; NADAI, T., "Improvement of the rectal bioavailability of latamoxef sodium by adjuvants following administration of a suppository", BIOLOGICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (1994), vol. 17, pages 1496 - 500, XP000482777
    - VAN HOOGDALEM, E. J.; GEERTS, J. A. M.; DE BOER, A. G.; BREIMER, D. D., "The influence of components on the rectal absorption of cefazolin in rats", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (1988), vol. 40, pages 815 - 7
    - VAN HOOGDALEM, E. J.; WACKWITZ, A. T. E.; DE BOER, A.; BREIMER, D. D., "3-Amino-1-hydroxypropylidene-1,1-diphosphonate (APD): a novel enhancer of rectal cefoxitin absorption in rats", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (1989), vol. 41, pages 339 - 41
    - UNOWSKY, J.; BEHL, C. R.; BESKID, G.; SATTLER, J.; HALPEM, J.; CLEELAND, R., "Effect of medium chain glycerides on enteral and rectal absorption of ß-lactam and aminoglycoside antibiotics", CHEMOTHERAPY, (1988), vol. 34, pages 272 - 6
    - BRIEDIGKEIT, W.; Gü6RES, E.; SCHNEEWEISS, B.; WACHHOLZ, E.; WIEGAND, U., "Zur Problematik einer rektalen Chloramphenikol-Applikation", PADIATRIE UND GRENZGEBIETE, (1972), vol. 11, pages 241 - 51
    - FAROUK, A.; REGDON, G.; MALLALATIF, G.; ABDEL HADI, I. A., "Comparative study on ampicillin bioavailability from capsule and suppositories", ACTA PHARMACEUTICA, (1984), vol. 54, pages 193 - 9
    - SJU6VALL, J.; WESTERLUND, D.; ALVAN, G.; MAGNI, L.; NORD, C. E.; SU6RSTAD, J., "Rectal bioavailability of bacampicillin hydrochloride in man as determined by reversed-phase liquid chromatography", CHEMOTHERAPY, (1984), vol. 30, pages 137 - 47
    - BERGSTR36M, B. K. V.; BERTILSON, S. O.; MOVIN, G., "Clinical evaluation of rectally administered ampicillin in acute otitis media", JOUMAL OF INTERNATIONAL MEDICAL RESEARCH, (1988), vol. 16, pages 376 - 85
    - DAVIS, S. S.; BURNHAM, W. R.; WILSON, P.; O'BRIEN, J., "Use of adjuvants for enhancement of rectal absorption of cefoxitin in humans", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1985), vol. 28, pages 211 - 5
    - VAN HOOGDALEM, E. J.; WACKWITZ, A. T. E.; DE BOER, A. G.; COHEN, A. F.; BREIMER, D. D., "Rate-controlled rectal absorption enhancement of cefoxitin by co-administration of sodium salicylate or sodium octanoate in healthy volunteers", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1989), vol. 27, pages 75 - 81
    - POZZI, E.; LUISETTI, M.; COPPI, G., "Sputum levels of erythromycin after rectal administration in adult patients with bronchitis", CURRENT THERAPEUTIC RESEARCH, (1983), vol. 33, pages 681 - 5
    - DE LA PIERRE, L.; ACERBI, L.; GARGANTINI, G.; MANZONI, D.; COPPI, G., "Livelli sierici di eritromicina dopo somministrazione rettale nella pratica pediatrica", GIORNALE ITALIANO DI CHEMIOTERAPIA, (1984), vol. 31, pages 229 - 32
    - ACERBI, L.; DE LA PIERRE, L.; PERIETTI, L.; COPPI,G., "Bioavailability studies of erythromycin administered by rectal route in paediatric patients", CHEMOTERAPIA, (1983), vol. 2, pages 200 - 2
    - STRATCHUNSKY, L. S.; NAZAROV, A. D.; FIRSOV, A. A.; PETRACHENKOVA, N. A., "Age dependence of erythromycin rectal bioavailability in children", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF DRUG METABOLISM AND PHARMACOKINETICS SPEC., (1991), pages 321 - 3
    - BERGAN, T.; ARNOLD, E., "Pharmacokinetics of metronidazole in healthy adult volunteers after tablets and suppositories", CHEMOTHERAPY, (1980), vol. 26, pages 231 - 41
    - MATTILA, J.; MANNISTO, P. T.; MäTYLA, R.; NYKäNEN, S.; LAMMINSIVU, U., "Comparative pharmacokinetics of metronidazole and tinidazole as influenced by administration route", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1983), vol. 23, pages 721 - 5
    - LIEDTKE, R.; HAASE, W., "Steady-state pharmacokinetics of sulfamethoxazole and trimethoprim in man after rectal application", ARZNEIMITTEL-FORSCHUNG, (1979), vol. 29, pages 345 - 9
    - ABD EJ-GAWAD, A. H.; RAMADAN, E.; NOUH, A. T., "Formulation and evaluation of trimethoprim-sulfamethoxazole suppositories", PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY, (1988), vol. 50, pages 257 - 60
    - WAGNER, J. G.; CARTER, C. H.; MARTENS, . J., "Serum concentrations after rectal administration of lincomycin hydrochloride", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY AND THE JOURNAL OF NEW DRUGS, (1968), vol. 8, pages 154 - 63, XP008009052
    - WAGNER, J. G.; LESLIE, L. G.; GOVE, R. S., "Relative absorption of both tetracycline and penicillin G administered rectally and orally in aqueous solution", ZEITSCHRIFT FüCR KLINISCHE PHARMAKOLOGIE, THERAPIE UND TOXIKOLGIE, (1969), vol. 2, pages 44 - 51
    - PFAFF, G.; ZIMMERMANN, T.; LACH, P.; YEATES, R.; SIMON, G.; WILDFEUER, A., "Pharmacokinetics and tolerance of fluconazole suppositories in healthy volunteers", ARZNEIMITTEL-FORSCHUNG, (1993), vol. 43, pages 391 - 5
    - JOANNIDES, L.; SOMOGYI, A.; SPICER, J.; HEINZON, B.; TONG, N.; FRANKLIN, C. ET AL., "Rectal administration of metronidazole provides therapeutic plasma levels in postoperative patients", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1981), vol. 305, pages 1569 - 70
    - E. BERGOGNE-BEREZINA; A. BRYSKIERB, "The suppository form of antibiotic administration: pharmacokinetics and clinical application", THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY- JOUMAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, (1999), vol. 43, pages 177 - 185
    - R. DUJANY, MANUALE PRATICO DI OMEOPATIA FAMILIARE E D'URGENZA RED EDIZIONI, (2004), page 291
    - D. DEMARQUE; J. JOUANNY; B. POITEVIN; V. SAINT JEAN., FARMACOLOGIA E MATERIA MEDICA OMEOPATICA TECNICHE NUOVE, (1999), page 480
    - DEWICK PAUL M., "Chimica, biosintesi e bioattività delle sostanze naturali", PICCIN-NUOVA LIBRARIA, (2000), page 500
    - D. DEMARQUE; J. JOUANNY; B. POITEVIN; V. SAINT JEAN, FARMACOLOGIA E MATERIA MEDICA OMEOPATICA TECNICHE NUOVE
other   - "Dawa-Baraa-e-Surfa Wa Zeeq-un-Nafas-1", TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/1487, XP003033232
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, Iiaaj-al-Amraaz, (1921), page 120
    - "Zimaad Bara-e-Zaat-ur-Riya", TKDL, Database accession no. AH3/2974, XP003033233
    - ALI IBN-E-ABBAAS MAJOOSI, kaamil-al-Sena'ah, (2005), vol. II, page 317
    - "Tila-e-Arzeez", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/82C, XP003033234
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azaam, (1896), vol. I, page 136
    - "Dawa-e-Munaffis", TKDL, Database accession no. AN4/61A, XP003033235
    - ALI IBN-E-ABBAAS MAJOOSI, Kaamil-al-Sena'ah, (2005), vol. I, page 187