Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2351073

EP2351073 - APPARATUS FOR DETECTING MICRO-CRACKS IN WAFERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/31]APPARATUS FOR DETECTING MICRO-CRACKS IN WAFERS AND METHOD THEREFOR
[2017/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): EE, SK
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
10.05.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2018/41]
Former [2018/27]For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95024 / US
Former [2018/07]For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95024 / US
Former [2011/31]For all designated states
Bluplanet Pte Ltd
1 Bukit Batok Crescent No. 09-48, WCEGA Plaza
Singapore 658064 / SG
Inventor(s)01 / CHAN, Sok Leng
Blk 231 Compassvale Walk 15-450
Singapore 540231 / SG
 [2011/31]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
[2018/27]
Former [2012/49]Andrews, Paul David , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2011/31]Wise, Stephen James
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date09829413.515.05.2009
[2011/31]
WO2009SG00174
Priority number, dateSG2008000873125.11.2008         Original published format: SG 200808731
[2011/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010062262
Date:03.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2351073
Date:03.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010
[2011/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2351073
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2351073
Date:07.11.2018
[2018/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR03.06.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/66, G01N21/95
[2017/51]
Former International [2014/04]H01L21/66, H01L31/042, G01N21/95
Former International [2011/31]H01L21/66, H01L31/042
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/27]
Former [2011/31]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION VON MIKRORISSEN IN WAFERN[2017/51]
English:APPARATUS FOR DETECTING MICRO-CRACKS IN WAFERS[2017/51]
French:APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE MICROFISSURES DANS DES TRANCHES[2017/51]
Former [2011/31]VORRICHTUNG ZUR FESTSTELLUNG VON MIKROBRÜCHEN IN WAFERN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR
Former [2011/31]APPARATUS FOR DETECTING MICRO-CRACKS IN WAFERS AND METHOD THEREFOR
Former [2011/31]APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE MICROFISSURES DANS DES TRANCHES ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ
Entry into regional phase15.02.2011National basic fee paid 
15.02.2011Search fee paid 
15.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
15.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/31]
17.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2018Fee for grant paid
25.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.09.2018Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2014
Opposition(s)05.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.08.2014Request for further processing filed
04.08.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.08.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
22.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
15.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
26.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201608   M06   Fee paid on   15.08.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/22]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
NO04.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL04.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1956366  (BASLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0023]; figure 4 * [I] 3,4,10,11;
 [A]JP2003247953  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 3,4,10,11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1801569  (BASLER AG [DE]) [A] 3,4,10,11 * paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *
International search[A]JP2008267851  (USHIO ELECTRIC INC);
 [A]KR940020481  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [A]US6829047  (FUJII TATSUYA [JP], et al)
ExaminationUS2004169850