blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2371975

EP2371975 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SINTERED ORE AND SINTERING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, MK
published on 05.08.2020  [2020/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JFE Steel Corporation
2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
[2011/40]
Inventor(s)01 / OYAMA, Nobuyuki
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE STEEL CORPORATION
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
02 / IWASAKI, Katsuhiro
c/o Technology Planning Dept.
JFE ENGINEERING CORPORATION
1 Suehiro-cho 2-chome
Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-8611 / JP
 [2011/40]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2018/28]
Former [2011/40]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date09830494.203.12.2009
[2018/28]
WO2009JP70636
Priority number, dateJP2008030917703.12.2008         Original published format: JP 2008309177
JP2008030917903.12.2008         Original published format: JP 2008309179
[2011/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2010064731
Date:10.06.2010
Language:JA
[2010/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2371975
Date:05.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2371975
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.06.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2016
ClassificationIPC:C22B1/20, F27B21/08
[2011/40]
CPC:
C22B1/205 (EP); C22B1/20 (EP,KR); F27B19/00 (KR);
F27B21/02 (EP); F27B21/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GESINTERTEM ERZ UND SINTERVORRICHTUNG[2011/40]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SINTERED ORE AND SINTERING APPARATUS[2011/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D UN MINERAI FRITTÉ ET APPAREIL DE FRITTAGE[2011/40]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2010Translation filed 
19.04.2011National basic fee paid 
19.04.2011Search fee paid 
19.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/40]
20.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2018Fee for grant paid
30.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.03.2018
Opposition(s)12.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
14.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.12.2009
AT11.07.2018
CY11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
MK11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
PT11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
TR11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
GB03.12.2018
IE03.12.2018
LU03.12.2018
MT03.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
[2020/31]
Former [2020/30]HU03.12.2009
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
PT11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
TR11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
GB03.12.2018
IE03.12.2018
LU03.12.2018
MT03.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/27]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
PT11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
TR11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
GB03.12.2018
IE03.12.2018
LU03.12.2018
MT03.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/16]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
TR11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
GB03.12.2018
IE03.12.2018
LU03.12.2018
MT03.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/08]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
GB03.12.2018
IE03.12.2018
LU03.12.2018
MT03.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/04]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
GB03.12.2018
IE03.12.2018
LU03.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
Former [2020/03]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
GB03.12.2018
IE03.12.2018
LU03.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
Former [2019/51]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
IE03.12.2018
LU03.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
Former [2019/49]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
IE03.12.2018
LU03.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
Former [2019/48]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
IE03.12.2018
LU03.12.2018
Former [2019/40]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
LU03.12.2018
Former [2019/39]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
LU03.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/24]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AT11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
IT11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AT11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
NO11.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL11.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]JPS5180608  ;
 [XI]JPS5651536  (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 17,20-22 * the whole document * [I] 1-16,18,19;
 [I]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (1976), vol. 1976, no. 35, Database accession no. 1976-65699X, XP002761567 & JPS5180608 A 19760714 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [I] 1-7,10-17,20,21 * abstract *
International search[A]JPS3916754B  (YOSHIO TAKAISHI);
 [A]JPS458541B  (FUJI SEITETSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [A]JPS6239126  (INOUE JAPAX RES, et al);
 [AP]JP2008291362  (JFE STEEL KK);
 [AP]WO2009107825  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al);
 [AP]JP2009228133  (NIPPON STEEL CORP)
by applicantJPS4627126B
 JPS4818102B
 JPS5518585
 JPH05311257
 WO2007052776
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.