Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2353174

EP2353174 - METHODS OF FABRICATING SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 07.06.2017  [2017/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
A Corporation Of The State Of Delaware 8000 South Federal Way
Boise, ID 83716 / US
[2011/32]
Inventor(s)01 / SILLS, Scott
1316 Gourley St.
Boise ID 83705 / US
02 / SANDHU, Gurtej, S.
2964 E. Parkriver Drive
Boise ID 83706 / US
03 / DEVILLIERS, Anton
3 Hidden Ridge
Boise ID 83716 / US
 [2011/32]
Representative(s)Somervell, Thomas Richard
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street
Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/32]Somervell, Thomas Richard
Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham
B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date09830819.011.11.2009
[2011/32]
WO2009US63999
Priority number, dateUS2008032843504.12.2008         Original published format: US 328435
[2011/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010065251
Date:10.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2353174
Date:10.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010
[2011/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.08.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/027
[2011/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/32]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUBSTRATEN[2011/32]
English:METHODS OF FABRICATING SUBSTRATES[2011/32]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE SUBSTRATS[2011/32]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2011National basic fee paid 
19.05.2011Search fee paid 
19.05.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/32]
27.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/23]
09.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
19.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/23]
19.01.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201608   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US6548385  (LAI JIUN-REN [TW]) [A] 8-13 * figure - *;
 [A]US2003091936  (ROTTSTEGGE JORG [DE] ET AL ROTTSTEGGE JOERG [DE] ET AL) [A] 8-13 * abstract *
International search[A]US2007026684  (STEFANO PARASCANDOLA ET AL.);
 [A]US2007099431  (MINGTAO LI);
 [A]US2007202697  (JAE CHANG JUNG);
 [A]US2007202671  (JAE CHANG JUNG)