Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2357546

EP2357546 - INPUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyocera Corporation
6, Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
[2011/33]
Inventor(s)01 / AONO, Tomotake
c/o KYOCERA Corporation
Yokohama Office
1-1 Kagahara 2-chome
Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8502 / JP
02 / SHIOKAWA, Yuta
1-18, Katase 2-chome
Fujisawa-shi
Kanagawa 251-0032 / JP
03 / TASHIRO, Kaoru
c/o KEIO UNIVERSITY
14-1 Hiyoshi 3-chome
Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223-0061 / JP
 [2012/03]
Former [2011/33]01 / AONO, Tomotake
c/o KYOCERA Corporation Yokohama Office 1-1 Kagahara 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8502 / JP
02 / SHIOKAWA, Yuta
c/o KEIO UNIVERSITY 1-1 Hiyoshi 4-chome Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223-0061 / JP
03 / TASHIRO, Kaoru
c/o KEIO UNIVERSITY 14-1 Hiyoshi 3-chome Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223-0061 / JP
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/33]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date09831684.707.12.2009
[2011/33]
WO2009JP06675
Priority number, dateJP2008031362009.12.2008         Original published format: JP 2008313620
[2011/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010067577
Date:17.06.2010
Language:JA
[2010/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2357546
Date:17.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.06.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/041
[2011/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/33]
TitleGerman:EINGABEVORRICHTUNG[2011/33]
English:INPUT DEVICE[2011/33]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE[2011/33]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2011Translation filed 
27.05.2011National basic fee paid 
27.05.2011Search fee paid 
27.05.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/33]
27.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP17197444.7  / EP3316090
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
23.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007236450  (COLGATE JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0052] - [0055] * * claims 1-6 *;
 [X]EP1956466  (UNIV LILLE SCIENCES TECH [FR]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] - [0044] - [0047] *;
 [X]  - BIET M ET AL, "A Piezoelectric Tactile Display Using Travelling Lamb Wave", PROCEEDINGS OF EUROHAPTICS, XX, XX, (20060705), pages 567 - 570, XP002438180 [X] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [X]  - WATANABE T ET AL, "A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TACTILE SENSATION OF SURFACE ROUGHNESS USING ULTRASONIC VIBRATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION. NAGOYA,JAPAN, MAY 21 - 27, 1995; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950521), doi:10.1109/ROBOT.1995.525433, ISBN 978-0-7803-1966-0, pages 1134 - 1139, XP000657310 [X] 1-3 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1995.525433
International search[Y]JPH10293644  (IDEC IZUMI CORP);
 [Y]JP2005332063  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]JP2001255993  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP)
by applicantJP2005092472