Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2361209

EP2361209 - FOLDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tecnau AB
Långgatan 21
341 32 Ljungby / SE
[2015/16]
Former [2011/35]For all designated states
Lasermax Roll Systems AB
Långgatan 21
341 32 Ljungby / SE
Inventor(s)01 / BENJAMINSSON, Peter
Replösavägen 18
341 38 Ljungby / SE
02 / ELIASSON, Hans
Fiskarvägen 10
S-341 40 Ljungby / SE
03 / PERSSON, Anders
Prästgatan 2
S-287 72 Traryd / SE
 [2011/35]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 17067
200 10 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2015/16]Valea AB
Anna Lindhs Plats 4
211 19 Malmö / SE
Former [2011/35]VALEA AB
Anna Lindhs Plats 4
211 19 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date09832205.010.12.2009
WO2009SE51400
Priority number, dateSE2008000255912.12.2008         Original published format: SE 0802559
[2011/35]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010068170
Date:17.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2361209
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010
[2011/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2361209
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE17.06.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65H45/22
[2011/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FALTVORRICHTUNG[2011/35]
English:FOLDING DEVICE[2011/35]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PLIAGE[2011/35]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2011National basic fee paid 
19.05.2011Search fee paid 
19.05.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/35]
07.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2015Fee for grant paid
06.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.11.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.12.2015  13.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Hunkeler AG
Bahnhofstrasse 31
4806 Wikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
 02  15.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
manroland Goss web systems GmbH
Alois-Senefelder-Allee 1
86153 Augsburg / DE
 [2018/49]
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2015  13.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Hunkeler AG
Bahnhofstrasse 31
4806 Wikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
 02  15.01.2016   
manroland web systems GmbH
Alois-Sennefelder-Allee 1
86219 Augsburg / DE
Former [2016/06]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2015   
Hunkeler AG
Bahnhofstrasse 31
4806 Wikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
26.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.06.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
06.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition05.09.2017Appeal received No.  T1943/17
10.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.12.2009
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MK15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
SM15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
IE10.12.2015
LU10.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
SE11.12.2018
[2019/34]
Former [2018/30]HU10.12.2009
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MK15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
SM15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
IE10.12.2015
LU10.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2017/38]HU10.12.2009
AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
SM15.04.2015
TR15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
IE10.12.2015
LU10.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/46]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
IE10.12.2015
LU10.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
IE10.12.2015
LU10.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
LU10.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
LU10.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SI15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/10]AT15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
PL15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/50]FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
IS15.08.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/49]FI15.04.2015
HR15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
NO15.07.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL15.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB2281738  (WEB PRINTING CONTROLS [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 8, line 3 - page 15, line 35; figure - * [I] 3,4,9,10;
 [I]DE102007012191  (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [I] 1,5-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0035] - [0052]; figure - *
International search[A]US5230501  (MELTON JAMES P [US]);
 [A]JPH1160004  (TECHNO OOTE KK);
 [A]EP1726548  (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]);
 [A]US4420148  (MEADOWS CLAYTON D [US])
by applicantGB2281738
OppositionGB2281738
 DE102007012191
 US4801853
 US4357560
 JP2988932B
 JP2000211784
 JPH0885659
    - JACOB TAL, "Relieving tension with electronic gearing'';", MACHINE DESIGN, (19980709), XP055269911
    - DARRELL WHITESIDE, Basics of Web Tension Control, St Louis, Missouri, (20070916), XP055263507