Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2393503

EP2393503 - AYURVEDIC FORMULATION FOR TREATING CORONARY HEART DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharma, Anurag
K-78, Hauz Khas Enclave
New Delhi 110 016 / IN
[2016/36]
Former [2011/50]For all designated states
Sharma, Anurag
5 Ballygunge Circular Road
Kolkata 700 019 / IN
Inventor(s)01 / DUBEY, G.P.
DST Tribal Medicine Project IMS
Banaras Hindu University
Uttar Pradesh / IN
02 / RAJAMANICKMAN, G.V.
Centre For Advance Research in
Indian System of Medicine
Sastra
Thanjavur Kerala / IN
 [2011/50]
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/36]Green, Mark Charles , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Former [2011/50]Green, Mark Charles , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
3rd Floor
33 Glasshouse Street
London W1B 5DG / GB
Former [2011/50]Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
Application number, filing date09832680.405.06.2009
[2016/36]
WO2009IN00324
Priority number, dateIN2009KOL019604.02.2009         Original published format: IN KO01962009
[2011/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010100652
Date:10.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2393503
Date:14.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010
[2011/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2393503
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT10.09.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/328, A61K36/28, A61K36/72, A61K36/185, A61P9/00
[2016/19]
Former International [2011/50]A61K36/328, A61K36/28, A61K36/72
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AYURVEDA-FORMULIERUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG KORONARER HERZERKRANKUNGEN[2011/50]
English:AYURVEDIC FORMULATION FOR TREATING CORONARY HEART DISEASE[2011/50]
French:NOUVELLE FORMULATION AYURVÉDIQUE PRÉCONISÉE POUR LA PRÉVENTION ET LA GESTION D'UNE MALADIE CORONARIENNE[2011/50]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2010National basic fee paid 
18.06.2010Search fee paid 
18.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2010Examination requested  [2011/50]
27.06.2012Observations by third parties
02.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2016Fee for grant paid
28.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2015
Opposition(s)08.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
17.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
17.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.06.2009
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CY07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
MK07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
IE05.06.2017
LU05.06.2017
MT05.06.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU05.06.2009
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CY07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
IE05.06.2017
LU05.06.2017
MT05.06.2017
Former [2019/31]HU05.06.2009
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
IE05.06.2017
LU05.06.2017
MT05.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
IE05.06.2017
LU05.06.2017
MT05.06.2017
Former [2018/23]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
IE05.06.2017
LU05.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
LU05.06.2017
Former [2018/11]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/37]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/13]ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/11]ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT07.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - SETH S D ET AL, "Role of Lipistat in protection against isoproterenol induced myocardial necrosis in rats: A biochemical and histopathological study", INDIAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, ASSOCIATION OF PHYSIOLOGISTS AND PHARMACOLOGISTS OF INDIA, IN, (19980101), vol. 42, no. 1, ISSN 0019-5499, pages 101 - 106, XP008141785 [Y] 1-6 * abstract, page 101 *
 [Y]  - SINGH R ET AL, "Evaluation of anti ischemic potential of pushkar- guggulu in the treatment of ischemic heart disease (IHD)", MEDICINAL & AROMATIC PLANTS ABSTRACTS, SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, NEW DELHI - INDIA, (20030401), vol. 25, no. 2, ISSN 0250-4367, XP018015756 [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - Bharata Bhaisajya Ratnakara, "Kakubhadicurnam", TKDL, (1999), Database accession no. AB/666, XP002682512 [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - Rasayoga Sagara, "Vajravallayadigugguluh", TKDL, (1998), Database accession no. VS/1092, XP002682514 [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - Brhat Nighantu Ratnakara [Saligramanighantubhusanam], "Cukra Gunaah", TKDL, Database accession no. RS/4372, XP002682515 [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - LARMO P ET AL, "Effects of sea buckthorn berries on infections and inflammation: A double-blind, randomized, placebo-controlled trial", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20080101), vol. 62, no. 9, ISSN 0954-3007, pages 1123 - 1130, XP008141784 [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
International search[A]WO2005016361  (AVESTHA GENGRAINE TECHNOLOGIES PVT.);
 [A]WO0190064  (SABINSA CORPORATION)
 [A]  - SETH S.D. ET AL., "Role of Lipistat in protection against isoproterenol induced myocardial necrosis in rats: A biochemical and histopathological study", INDIAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (199801), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 101 - 106, XP008141785
 [A]  - SINGH R. ET AL., "Evaluation of anti ischemic potential of pushkar- guggulu in the treatment of ischemic heart disease (IHD)", MEDICINAL & AROMATIC PLANTS ABSTRACTS, vol. 25, no. 2, XP008141788
 [A]  - LARMO P. ET AL., "Effects of sea buckthorn berries on infections and inflammation: A double-blind, randomized, placebo-controlled trial", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, (2008), vol. 62, no. 9, pages 1123 - 1130, XP008141784
other   - "Kakubhadicurnam", TKDL, Database accession no. AB/666, XP003030582
    - Bharata Bhaisajya Ratnakara, (1999), vol. I, page 210
    - "Vajravallayadigugguluh", TKDL, Database accession no. VS/1092, XP003030583
    - Rasayoga Sagara, (1998), vol. II, page 333
    - "Medonilaharanamagryasamgrahahdravyam", TKDL, Database accession no. RK/189, XP003030584
    - VAGBHATA, Astanga Samgraha, (1991), page 195
    - "Kakubha (Arjuna) Gunah", TKDL, Database accession no. RS/3381, XP003030585
    - BHAVAMISRA, Bhavaprakasa, (1999), page 523
    - "Cukra Gunaah", TKDL, Database accession no. RS/4372, XP003030586
    - Bhrat Nighantu, (1997), vol. IV, page 186
    - "Puskaramula Curna", TKDL, Database accession no. AK11/1811, XP003030587
    - VANGASENA, Vangasena, (1996), page 458
    - "Madhumeha Vanga Yoga", TKDL, Database accession no. RS1/565, XP003030588
    - VAGBHATTAH, Rasaratnasamuccayah, (2000), page 290
    - "Silajatu Vati", TKDL, Database accession no. RS22/855, XP003030589
    - Rasatantrasarah Evam Siddhaprayogasamgrahah, (1990), page 648