Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2371493

EP2371493 - POWER TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/40]WORKING TOOL
[2015/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.06.2016
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Makita Corporation
3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho
Anjo-shi, Aichi 446-8502 / JP
[2011/40]
Inventor(s)01 / SHINMA Yasutoshi
c/o MAKITA CORPORATION
3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8502 / JP
02 / KAKIUCHI Yasuhiro
c/o MAKITA CORPORATION
3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8502 / JP
 [2011/40]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[2015/33]
Former [2011/40]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date09833358.608.12.2009
[2015/33]
WO2009JP70554
Priority number, dateJP2008032478919.12.2008         Original published format: JP 2008324789
[2011/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010071054
Date:24.06.2010
Language:JA
[2010/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2371493
Date:05.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2371493
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.06.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B25D17/20, B25F5/00
[2013/36]
Former International [2011/40]B25D17/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROWERKZEUG[2015/18]
English:POWER TOOL[2015/18]
French:OUTIL ÉLÉCTRIQUE[2015/18]
Former [2011/40]ARBEITSWERKZEUG
Former [2011/40]WORKING TOOL
Former [2011/40]OUTIL DE TRAVAIL
Entry into regional phase01.07.2011Translation filed 
01.07.2011National basic fee paid 
01.07.2011Search fee paid 
01.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/40]
20.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2015Fee for grant paid
01.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2014
Opposition(s)13.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
06.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.12.2009
AT12.08.2015
BE12.08.2015
BG12.08.2015
CY12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
MK12.08.2015
MT12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SI12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
SM12.08.2015
TR12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IE08.12.2015
LU08.12.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/38]HU08.12.2009
AT12.08.2015
BE12.08.2015
BG12.08.2015
CY12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
MT12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SI12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
SM12.08.2015
TR12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IE08.12.2015
LU08.12.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2017/03]AT12.08.2015
BE12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SI12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IE08.12.2015
LU08.12.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/46]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SI12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IE08.12.2015
LU08.12.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SI12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IE08.12.2015
LU08.12.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SI12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
LU08.12.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
LU08.12.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
MC12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/23]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
RO12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
SK12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/22]AT12.08.2015
CZ12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
EE12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/21]AT12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
IT12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/20]AT12.08.2015
DK12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/14]AT12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
NL12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/11]AT12.08.2015
ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES12.08.2015
FI12.08.2015
HR12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
PL12.08.2015
SE12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
IS12.12.2015
PT14.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI12.08.2015
LT12.08.2015
LV12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
GR13.11.2015
Former [2016/08]LT12.08.2015
NO12.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT12.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[IY]DE19600339  (KRESS ELEKTRIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [I] 1,4 * column 3, lines 3-65; figures 1-6; claim 1 * [Y] 2,3;
 [I]JPS50136866U  (-) [I] 1,2,4 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]US6127751  (KRISTEN FERDINAND [DE], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3003073  (BIXLER JOHN R, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]CH288853  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
International search[X]JP2004167639
 [X]JP2006175592
 [X]JP2005193310
by applicant JPH11309682