blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2376422 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2376422



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 598
17.05.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.02.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
10.09.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.09.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.02.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 10
04.02.2015 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 18
17.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
17.12.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
17.12.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
17.12.2014 Description Search / examination 6
17.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.12.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.09.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
18.09.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.09.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
13.06.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
13.06.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
13.06.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
13.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.06.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 114
03.12.2012 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
26.11.2012 Observations by third parties Search / examination 15
26.11.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
26.11.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
26.11.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
26.11.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
26.11.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 32
26.11.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
26.11.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
26.11.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
14.11.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.11.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 5
14.11.2012 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
17.07.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.07.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 6
11.07.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 6
05.07.2012 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 3
21.09.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.08.2011 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
15.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.07.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.07.2011 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.07.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
29.04.2011 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
16.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
16.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 60
16.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 58
24.06.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
24.06.2010 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 69