blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2376422


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.05.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
15.02.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
04.02.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
21.09.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.02.2015 New entry: Observations by third parties
06.01.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2014 First examination report
17.09.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.12.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.06.2013 Amendment by applicant
14.12.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.11.2012 New entry: Observations by third parties
09.11.2012 Supplementary search report published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
09.11.2012 Change - classification published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
09.11.2012 Change - classification published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
13.07.2012 Change - applicant published on  15.08.2012  [2012/33]
16.03.2012 Change - inventor published on  18.04.2012  [2012/16]
24.02.2012 Change - extension states published on  28.03.2012  [2012/13]
15.12.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.10.2011  [2011/42]
16.09.2011 Request for examination filed published on  19.10.2011  [2011/42]
22.08.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
28.07.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2011 Amendment by applicant
09.07.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
25.06.2010 PCT data prior to European publication