Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2376422

EP2376422 - CYCLOHEXANE OXIDATION PROCESS BYPRODUCT STREAM DERIVATIVES AND METHODS FOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Invista Technologies S.à.r.l.
Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen
Kreuzackerstrasse 9
9000 St. Gallen / CH
[2012/33]
Former [2011/42]For all designated states
Invista Technologies S.A R.L.
Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Pestalozzistrasse 2
9000 St. Gallen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BEATTY, Richard, P.
11 Deer Path Lane
Newark, DE 19711-4393 / US
 [2012/16]
Former [2011/42]01 / BEATTY, Richard, P.
11 Deer Path Lane
Newark DE 19711-4393 / US
Representative(s)Cockerton, Bruce Roger , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/42]Cockerton, Bruce Roger , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date09833814.811.12.2009
WO2009US67644
Priority number, dateUS20090183131P02.06.2009         Original published format: US 183131 P
US20090148433P30.01.2009         Original published format: US 148433 P
US20080138697P18.12.2008         Original published format: US 138697 P
[2011/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010071761
Date:24.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2376422
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010
[2011/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU24.06.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:C07C69/00, C09K8/03, G03F7/42, C09D9/00, C09K8/52
[2011/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleGerman:NEBENPRODUKTSTROMDERIVATE AUS EINEM CYCLOHEXANOXIDATIONSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2011/42]
English:CYCLOHEXANE OXIDATION PROCESS BYPRODUCT STREAM DERIVATIVES AND METHODS FOR USING THE SAME[2011/42]
French:DÉRIVÉS D'UN FLUX DE SOUS-PRODUITS D'UN PROCÉDÉ D'OXYDATION DE CYCLOHEXANE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI[2011/42]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2011National basic fee paid 
15.07.2011Search fee paid 
15.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/42]
26.11.2012Observations by third parties
13.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2015Observations by third parties
10.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/25]
16.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO2009059913  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [XP] 1-5,17 * page 6, line 27 - page 10, line 16 *;
 [X]US7449609  (HAUNERT ANDREA [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,18 * column 1, line 11 - line 18; example 3; claims 1-6,14-17 * * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 27; example 2; claims 1-6,14-17 *;
 [X]US5773091  (PERLMAN DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * example 2 *;
 [X]US6511547  (SAHBARI JAVAD J [US]) [X] 1-3,6-12,21,22 * experimental part;; claims 1,6 *;
 [X]JP2003027091  (JAPAN ENERGY CORP) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-13,21,22 * WPI abstract *;
 [X]JPH0693293  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-3,6-9,21,22 * WPI abstract *;
 [X]US5624599  (GUMMESON JOEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,14,16 * column 1, line 5 - line 38; examples 1-7; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]US6008418  (BAUR KARL GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,18 * column 3, line 5 - column 6, line 14; figure 3 * * column 3, line 39 - column 6, line 14; figure 3 *
International search[X]EP1975146  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]);
 [X]US5981769  (BAUR KARL GERHARD [DE], et al);
 [X]EP0606553  (CONOCO INC [US]);
 [X]US5030290  (DAVIS ELBERT [US]);
 [X]US5354492  (SHORT SIDNEY M [US]);
 [X]US5672579  (DIAZ IRIS MARGARITA [US], et al);
 [X]US2004031611  (HUANG TIANPING [US], et al);
 [X]US2003113673  (AHN SEUNG-HYUN [KR], et al);
 [X]US2008081778  (DECKER JAMES D [US]);
 [X]WO9219710  (DU PONT [US]);
 [X]JPH0532453  ;
 [X]US3642503  (BEANEY PETER AUSTIN);
 [X]US6743275  (COBETT THOMAS A [US]);
 [X]US4541833  (MUELLER WARREN B [US])
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN,
otherUS2007112225
 EP1975146
 JPH0532453
 US2004031611
 EP0606553
 US5030290
 US2003199406
 US2008081778
 JP2005170880
    - SILMACO SILICATES MANUFACTURING COMPANY, "Sodiumsilicate liquid.", SAFETY DATA SHEET, pages 1 - 4, XP003029288