Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2353137

EP2353137 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR RISK MANAGEMENT OF SPORTS-ASSOCIATED BUSINESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.07.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crystal World Holdings, Inc.
1701 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006 / US
[2011/32]
Inventor(s)01 / RABALAIS, Christopher, Paul
6942 Fm 1960 E 384
Humble TX 77346 / US
02 / BROWN-HRUSKA, Sharon, Joy
6061 Ridge Ford Drive
Burke VA 22015 / US
03 / OZGIT, Emin, Alper
B1844 Mission Hills Ln.
Northbrook, IL 60062-5758 / US
04 / GUTH, Louis
189 Golf Village Boulevard
Jupiter FL 33458 / US
05 / DURAN, JR., Carlos, Miguel
Urbaniciacion Quernavaca
Casa 4
Rio de Oro-Santa Ana / CR
 [2011/45]
Former [2011/32]01 / RABALAIS, Christopher, Paul
6942 Fm 1960 E 384
Humble TX 77346 / US
02 / BROWN-HRUSKA, Sharon, Joy
6061 Ridge Ford Drive
Burke VA 22015 / US
03 / OZGIT, Emin, Alper
440 N Wabash Avenue, 3602
Chicago IL 60611 / US
04 / GUTH, Louis
189 Golf Village Boulevard
Jupiter FL 33458 / US
05 / DURAN, JR., Carlos, Miguel
Urbaniciacion Quernavaca Casa 4
Rio de Oro-Santa Ana / CR
Representative(s)Hutchinson, Thomas Owen
Hutchinson IP Ltd
57 Hoghton Street
Southport, Merseyside PR9 0PG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/39]Hutchinson, Thomas Owen
Hutchinson IP Ltd
57 Hoghton Street
Southport PR9 0PG / GB
Former [2011/32]Hutchinson, Thomas Owen
Hutchinson IP Ltd Hoghton Street
Southport, Merseyside PR9 0PG / GB
Application number, filing date09835790.822.12.2009
[2011/32]
WO2009US69276
Priority number, dateUS20080139809P22.12.2008         Original published format: US 139809 P
[2011/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010075435
Date:01.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2353137
Date:10.08.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010
[2011/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR16.09.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q40/00, G06Q10/00, G06Q50/00
[2012/21]
Former International [2011/32]G06Q50/00, G06Q40/00, G06Q10/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/32]
Extension statesAL28.04.2011
BA28.04.2011
RS28.04.2011
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR RISIKOVERWALTUNG IN MIT SPORT ASSOZIIERTEN GESCHÄFTEN[2011/32]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR RISK MANAGEMENT OF SPORTS-ASSOCIATED BUSINESSES[2011/32]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DES RISQUES D'ENTREPRISES SPORTIVES[2011/32]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2011National basic fee paid 
28.04.2011Search fee paid 
28.04.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/32]
26.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2014Date of oral proceedings
14.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
14.05.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination09.07.2014Appeal received No.  T1928/14
03.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP14156138.1  / EP2741251
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
04.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
15.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
11.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[L]  - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-21 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods (OJ 11/2007; p592f) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. *
International search[A]US2007244878  (C. HULME ET AL.);
 [A]US2007022029  (J. MA ET AL.);
 [A]KR20080058930  (DOOSAN INFRACORE CORP.);
 [A]KR20020060059  (JO, HO KUN);
 [A]KR20050069964  (LEE, JAE MIN);
 [A]JPH0822450  (KANEMOTO TAKATANE)