Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2382765

EP2382765 - ENHANCED MULTIPARTY CONFERENCE OUTDIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.07.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2014  [2014/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2011/44]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / HULTKRANTZ, Jan
Skaldevägen 80
S-167 73 Bromma / SE
02 / PEJMO, Fredrik
Sveavägen 33
19134 Sollentuna / SE
 [2011/45]
Former [2011/44]01 / HULTKRANTZ, Jan
Skaldevägen 80
S-167 73 Bromma / SE
02 / PEJMO, Fredrik
Nåttarövägen 31
S-124 51 Bandhagen / SE
Representative(s)Egrelius, Fredrik , et al
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/21]Egrelius, Fredrik , et al
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista Device, Service & Media
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2011/44]Norin, Klas , et al
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torshamnsgatan 21-23
SE-164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date09839362.227.01.2009
WO2009SE50080
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010087744
Date:05.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2382765
Date:02.11.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010
[2011/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.08.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/56, H04M3/493, H04N7/15, G10L13/00, G10L15/00
[2011/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR 
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE HINAUSWAHL BEI KONFERENZEN MIT MEHREREN TEILNEHMERN[2011/44]
English:ENHANCED MULTIPARTY CONFERENCE OUTDIAL[2011/44]
French:APPELS DE CONFÉRENCES TÉLÉPHONIQUES AMÉLIORÉS[2011/44]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2011National basic fee paid 
19.07.2011Search fee paid 
19.07.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
19.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/44]
30.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/33]
11.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2008247530  (BARTON WILLIAM F [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0028] * * claim 13 *;
 [Y]WO2008064483  (WANLESS JAMES ANDREW [CA], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0077] *;
 [Y]US2004203637  (DODLA UDAY [US]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] *;
 [A]US2006126803  (PATEL LABHESH [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] *
International search[X]US2008247530  (BARTON WILLIAM F [US], et al);
 [X]US2008032747  (HOLT SCOTT C [US], et al);
 [A]WO2008064483  (WANLESS JAMES ANDREW [CA], et al);
 [A]US2005094794  (CREAMER THOMAS E [US], et al);
 [A]US6404876  (SMITH ROBERT C [US], et al)
 [A]  - "SyncML Sync Protocol, version 1.1", OPEN MOBILE ALLIANCE, (20020215), URL: http://www.openmobilealliance.org/tech/affiliates/syncml/syncml_sync_protocol_v11_20020215.pdf, (20090923), XP003025650