blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2445286

EP2445286 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION DEVICE, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, MK
published on 29.07.2020  [2020/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2017/32]
Former [2012/17]For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ODE, Takayoshi
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Takaharu
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2012/17]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[2017/32]
Former [2012/17]Stebbing, Timothy Charles
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date09846113.015.06.2009
[2017/32]
WO2009JP02693
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2010146617
Date:23.12.2010
Language:JA
[2010/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2445286
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2445286
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.12.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:H04J13/00, H04W16/28, H04J11/00, H04B7/024, H04L25/03, H04L5/00, // H04W72/08, H04W72/12, H04W72/04
[2017/12]
CPC:
H04B7/024 (EP,CN,KR,US); H04W72/0466 (KR,US); H04J11/0053 (EP,CN,US);
H04L25/03866 (US); H04L5/0035 (US); H04W72/542 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/27 (EP,CN,US) (-)
Former IPC [2015/23]H04W72/04, H04J13/00, H04W16/28, H04J11/00, H04B7/02, // H04W72/08, H04W72/12
Former IPC [2012/17]H04W72/04, H04J13/00, H04W16/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, ENDGERÄT UND DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2012/17]
English:WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION DEVICE, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2012/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2012/17]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2011Translation filed 
09.01.2012National basic fee paid 
09.01.2012Search fee paid 
09.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/17]
26.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2017Fee for grant paid
27.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15201703.4  / EP3026972
EP16202788.2  / EP3157183
EP16202789.0  / EP3169007
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.09.2016
Opposition(s)11.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
02.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
04.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.06.2009
AT09.08.2017
CY09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
MK09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
PT09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
TR09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
[2020/31]
Former [2020/28]HU15.06.2009
AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
PT09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
TR09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2020/27]HU15.06.2009
AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
PT09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
TR09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2020/15]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
TR09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2019/15]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1983792  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] ** paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] *;
 [XI]  - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Further Considerations and Link Simulations on Reference Signals in LTE-A", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090875, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090204), no. Athens, Greece; 20090204, XP050318724 [X] 1,7-15 * Section 1, last sentence; page 1 * [I] 2-6
International search[A]JP2006311475  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]);
 [A]  - NORTEL, "Cell Clustering for CoMP Transmission/ Reception", 3GPP TSG-RAN WORKING GROUP 1 MEETING #55, R1-084464, (20081110), XP050317718
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Consideration on CoMP in LTE-Advanced", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 MEETING #55, R1-084203, (20081110), XP050317492
by applicantJP2006311475
 JP2008092379
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.