EP2417892 - ROBOT CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2016/23] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sung-Guen LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | 02 /
SHIM, In-Bo LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | 03 /
YIM, Byung-Doo LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Bong-Ju LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | 05 /
SUNG, Ji-Hoon LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | [2016/23] |
Former [2012/07] | 01 /
KIM, Sung-Guen LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon City Gyoungsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | ||
02 /
SHIM, In-Bo LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon City Gyoungsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | |||
03 /
YIM, Byung-Doo LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon City Gyoungsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Bong-Ju LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon City Gyoungsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | |||
05 /
SUNG, Ji-Hoon LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon City Gyoungsangnam-do 641-711 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/23] |
Former [2012/07] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09846852.3 | 30.06.2009 | [2016/23] | WO2009KR03562 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011002113 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417892 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417892 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/28, A47L9/04, A47L11/24 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
A47L9/0411 (EP,US);
A47L9/28 (KR);
A47L11/24 (KR);
A47L9/04 (KR);
A47L9/0433 (EP,US);
A47L9/0444 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSROBOTER | [2012/07] | English: | ROBOT CLEANER | [2012/07] | French: | ROBOT NETTOYEUR | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2011 | Translation filed | 09.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 27.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16158471.9 / EP3053502 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2009 | AT | 08.06.2016 | BE | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | NL | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | IE | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | LU | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
LU | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
LU | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.06.2009 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006032013 (KIM YOUNG-GIE [KR]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0036] *; | [Y]WO2007065034 (IROBOT CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 12, lines 3-21 * * page 13, lines 1-15 *; | [Y]WO2008091199 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 7, line 35 - page 10, line 9 *; | [Y]US3671996 (GAUDRY PAUL EMILE) [Y] 1-7 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 31 *; | [Y]US4847944 (LACKNER JOHN R [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 4, lines 34-41; figure 3 * | International search | [Y]KR20040105509 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]KR20060042801 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20060131419 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]KR20080000186 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |