Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2011002413

WO2011002413 - IMPROVED UMBRELLA DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2012  [2012/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Home Of Creative Design Pte Ltd
Block 4010 Ang Mo Kio Avenue 10 05-11 Techplace 1
Singapore 569626 / SG
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / FOO, Chen, Wei
Block 4010 Ang Mo Kio
Avenue 10 05-11 Techplace 1
Singapore 569626 / SG
[N/P]
Application number, filing date09846920.829.06.2009
WO2009SG00237
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011002413
Date:06.01.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011
[2011/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU06.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:A45B25/00, A45B25/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleEnglish:IMPROVED UMBRELLA DESIGN
French:CONFIGURATION DE PARAPLUIE AMÉLIORÉE
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2012/30]
31.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/30]
07.03.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2012/30]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.01.201203   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5111835  (LIN HOU-TU [TW]);
 [A]JPH0810020  (HIYOSHI KENSETSU KK);
 [A]US2004211451  (GOH HOCK POH [SG])