Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2320598

EP2320598 - MULTICAST PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.09.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2011/19]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / HE, Yuanling
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / LI, Mingsheng
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / YUAN, Liquan
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2012/41]
Former [2011/19]01 / HE, Yuanling
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen
Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / LI, Mingsheng
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen
Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / YUAN, Liquan
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen
Guangdong 518057 / CN
Representative(s)Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB (Stockholm)
Box 5366
102 49 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/41]Israelsson, Stefan
Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O. Box 5366
102 49 Stockholm / SE
Former [2011/19]Israelsson, Stefan
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58
114 50 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date09847264.025.12.2009
[2011/19]
WO2009CN76031
Priority number, dateCN2009115199215.07.2009         Original published format: CN200910151992
[2011/19]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011006339
Date:20.01.2011
Language:ZH
[2011/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2320598
Date:11.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2320598
Date:10.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN20.01.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/00, H04L12/18
[2012/17]
Former International [2011/19]H04L12/18, H04B10/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/19]
TitleGerman:MULTICAST-VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG[2011/19]
English:MULTICAST PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS[2011/19]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DIFFUSION GROUPÉE[2011/19]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2011Translation filed 
29.03.2011National basic fee paid 
29.03.2011Search fee paid 
29.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/19]
31.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2012Fee for grant paid
30.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.06.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.07.2013  20.02.2017  WITHDRAWN
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Opponent's representative
Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
 [2017/13]
Former [2013/33]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2013   
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Opponent's representative
Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
14.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.01.2014Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2014Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
12.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
29.05.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
27.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0129/16
23.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.12.2009
AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
CY10.10.2012
CZ10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
EE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
IT10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
MK10.10.2012
MT10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
RO10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
SK10.10.2012
SM10.10.2012
TR10.10.2012
IE25.12.2012
LU25.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2014/46]HU25.12.2009
AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
CY10.10.2012
CZ10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
EE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
IT10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
MT10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
RO10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
SK10.10.2012
SM10.10.2012
TR10.10.2012
IE25.12.2012
LU25.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/34]HU25.12.2009
AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
CY10.10.2012
CZ10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
EE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
IT10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
MT10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
RO10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
SK10.10.2012
SM10.10.2012
TR10.10.2012
IE25.12.2012
LU25.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2014/27]AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
CY10.10.2012
CZ10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
EE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
IT10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
MT10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
RO10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
SK10.10.2012
SM10.10.2012
TR10.10.2012
IE25.12.2012
LU25.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2014/21]AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
CY10.10.2012
CZ10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
EE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
IT10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
MT10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
RO10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
SK10.10.2012
TR10.10.2012
IE25.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
CY10.10.2012
CZ10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
EE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
IT10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
MT10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
RO10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
SK10.10.2012
IE25.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2013/51]AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
CZ10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
EE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
IT10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
MT10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
RO10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
SK10.10.2012
IE25.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2013/47]AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
CZ10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
EE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
IT10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
RO10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
SK10.10.2012
IE25.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
CZ10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
EE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
IT10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
RO10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
SK10.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
CZ10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
EE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
SK10.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
DK10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
BG10.01.2013
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2013/33]AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
MC31.12.2012
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT10.10.2012
BE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
PT11.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE10.10.2012
FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
NO10.01.2013
GR11.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI10.10.2012
HR10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
LV10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
PL10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
NO10.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI10.10.2012
LT10.10.2012
NL10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
NO10.01.2013
ES21.01.2013
IS10.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT10.10.2012
SE10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
NO10.01.2013
Former [2013/20]LT10.10.2012
SI10.10.2012
NO10.01.2013
Former [2013/11]SI10.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005135365  (SUNG JUNG S [KR] ET AL SUNG JUNG SIK [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008198857  (KIM CHAN [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
International search[XP]EP2117167  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY);
 [AP]CN101557338  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD);
 [A]CN101399820  (ZTE CORP);
 [A]JP2008187236  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP)