Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2454378

EP2454378 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR DNA ISOLATION ON A MICROFLUIDIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon U.S. Life Sciences, Inc.
9800 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
[2015/52]
Former [2012/21]For all designated states
Canon U.S. Life Sciences, Inc.
9800 Medical Center Drive, Suite A100
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STONE, Michele, R.
9800 Medical Center Drive
Suite A-100
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
 [2012/21]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2012/21]
Application number, filing date09847444.817.07.2009
[2015/52]
WO2009US51038
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011008217
Date:20.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2454378
Date:23.05.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011
[2012/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2454378
Date:23.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.01.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, C12N15/10
[2012/48]
Former International [2012/21]C12Q1/68, C12P19/34
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR DNA-ISOLATION BEI EINER MIKROFLUIDISCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2012/21]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR DNA ISOLATION ON A MICROFLUIDIC DEVICE[2012/21]
French:MÉTHODES ET SYSTÈMES D'ISOLEMENT D'ADN SUR UN DISPOSITIF MICROFLUIDIQUE[2012/43]
Former [2012/21]MÉTHODES ET SYSTÈMES D ISOLEMENT D ADN SUR UN DISPOSITIF MICROFLUIDIQUE
Entry into regional phase31.01.2012National basic fee paid 
31.01.2012Search fee paid 
31.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/21]
27.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
31.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2015Fee for grant paid
30.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.06.2013
Opposition(s)26.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
31.03.2014Request for further processing filed
31.03.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.04.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.07.2009
AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
BG23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE17.07.2016
LU17.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/33]HU17.07.2009
AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE17.07.2016
LU17.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2018/29]HU17.07.2009
AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE17.07.2016
LU17.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU17.07.2009
AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE17.07.2016
LU17.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/41]AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE17.07.2016
LU17.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/22]AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
FR01.08.2016
Former [2017/15]AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2017/03]AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/46]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
IT23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/26]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT23.12.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005142570  (PARTHASARATHY RANJANI V [US] ET AL) [X] 1-9,14-16 * paragraphs [[0017]] , [ [0032]] , [ [0050]] , [ [0067]]; figure -; claim - * * the whole document * * paragraphs [[0073]] - [[0077]] - [ [0144]] - [[0150]] - [ [0157]] *;
 [A]US5643455  (KOPP CLINTON VIRGIL [AU] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003230486  (CHIEN RING-LING [US] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007068812  (HAN JUNG-IM [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2005142571  (PARTHASARATHY RANJANI V [US] ET AL) [X] 1-9,13-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2005142663  (PARTHASARATHY RANJANI V [US] ET AL) [X] 1-9,13-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2007035498  (LIVING MICROSYSTEMS [US]; GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]; KAPUR RAVI [US]; HUA) [X] 1-4,10-12 * the whole document * * figures 87-89; example 23; claim - *;
 [E]WO2010009415  (CANON US LIFE SCIENCES INC [US]; CAO WEIDONG [US]; INOUE HIROSHI [US];) [E] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - CHIEN-HSUAN TAI ET AL, "Automatic microfluidic platform for cell separation and nucleus collection", BIOMEDICAL MICRODEVICES, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20070517), vol. 9, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S10544-007-9061-7, ISSN 1572-8781, pages 533 - 543, XP019524273 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10544-007-9061-7
International search[X]US2005142570  (PARTHASARATHY RANJANI V [US], et al);
 [Y]US5643455  (KOPP CLINTON VIRGIL [AU], et al);
 [Y]US7160423  (CHIEN RING-LING [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007068812  (HAN JUNG-IM [KR], et al)
by applicantUS2005142570
 US5643455
 US2003230486
 US2007068812
 US2005142571
 WO2007035498
 US8313906
 US2005042639
 US7629124
 US2008003593
 US8058054
 US2009053726
 US2009111149
 US2008003539
    - CHIEN-HSUAN TAI ET AL., BIOMEDICAL MICRODEVICES, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (20070517), vol. 9, pages 533 - 543