Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2483798

EP2483798 - ENHANCING BIOMETRIC SECURITY OF A SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2018  [2018/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/32]For all designated states
Intel Corporation
M/S RNB - 4-150 2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUANG, Zou
Room 401
Building 61
No. 750 Jinyang Rd.
Shanghai 200136 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Qunzhong
c/o Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
M/S RNB4-140
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
03 / GUI, Kai
c/o Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
M/S RNB4-140
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
04 / TOBIAS, M., Kohlenberg
9915 SW 48th Avenue
Portland, OR 97219 / US
 [2012/37]
Former [2012/34]01 / HUANG, Zou
Room 401
Building 61
No. 750 Jinyang Rd.
Shanghai 200136 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Qunzhong
No. 880, Zixing Rd.
Shanghai 200241 / CN
03 / GUI, Kai
c/o Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
M/S RNB4-140
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
04 / TOBIAS, M., Kohlenberg
9915 SW 48th Avenue
Portland, OR 97219 / US
Former [2012/32]01 / HUANG, Zou
Room 401
Building 61
No. 750 Jinyang Rd.
Shanghai 200136 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Qunzhong
No. 880, Zixing Rd.
Shanghai 200241 / CN
03 / GUI, Kai
Heqing Road
Lane 22
Minhang District
Shanghai 200241 / CN
04 / TOBIAS, M., Kohlenberg
9915 SW 48th Avenue
Portland, OR 97219 / US
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/32]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date09849941.130.09.2009
WO2009CN01114
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011038533
Date:07.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2483798
Date:08.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011
[2012/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.04.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/32
[2013/48]
Former International [2012/32]G06F17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/32]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNG DER BIOMETRISCHEN SICHERHEIT EINES SYSTEMS[2012/32]
English:ENHANCING BIOMETRIC SECURITY OF A SYSTEM[2012/32]
French:AMÉLIORATION DE LA SÉCURITÉ BIOMÉTRIQUE D'UN SYSTÈME[2012/32]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2012National basic fee paid 
21.03.2012Search fee paid 
21.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/32]
22.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/36]
30.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201709   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1418486  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * the whole document * [I] 3-12,15;
 [XI]US2003152253  (WONG JACOB Y [US]) [X] 1,13 * paragraphs [0036] - [0043] - [0045] * * figure 3 * [I] 2-12,14,15;
 [XI]US6393139  (LIN MIN-HSIUNG [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13 * the whole document * [I] 3-12,14,15
International search[Y]CN101436935  (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH [CN]);
 [Y]CN101261679  (UNIV CHONGQING [CN]);
 [A]US2007276805  (HUANG CHENG-SU [TW])