Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2488960

EP2488960 - HETEROGENEOUS DATA SOURCE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/25]For all designated states
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
Former [2012/34]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77707 / US
Inventor(s)01 / EDWARDS, Nigel
Filton Rd.
Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
02 / KIRSHNICK, Johannes
Filton Rd.
Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
 [2012/34]
Representative(s)ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Rambla Catalunya, 123
08008 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Benson, Christopher
Harrison Goddard Foote
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield, South Yorkshire S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date09850474.915.10.2009
WO2009US60923
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011046560
Date:21.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2488960
Date:22.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011
[2012/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.04.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00, G06F19/00, G06F17/30
[2016/31]
Former International [2012/34]G06F17/00, G06F19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/34]
TitleGerman:VERWALTUNG VON HETEROGENEN DATENQUELLEN[2012/34]
English:HETEROGENEOUS DATA SOURCE MANAGEMENT[2012/34]
French:GESTION DE SOURCES DE DONNÉES HÉTÉROGÈNES[2012/34]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2012National basic fee paid 
18.01.2012Search fee paid 
18.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/34]
15.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/15]
04.03.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.08.2019
08.08.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO03034263  (DIRECT COMP RESOURCES INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 12, line 3 - page 14, line 19; figures 1,1A-1E * [I] 2-8,10-15;
 [I]US2008040326  (CHANG YUAN-CHI [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] *;
 [A]US2008238923  (LIU ZHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0101] *
International search[A]EP1039398  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 [A]US6587837  (SPAGNA RICHARD [US], et al);
 [A]KR20010083845  (GO YONG WON [KR], et al);
 [A]KR20020007561  (WISEITECH CO LTD [KR]);
 [E]KR20090113538  (WISEITECH CO LTD [KR])