blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2498394

EP2498394 - VEHICLE GENERATED VOLTAGE CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  27.06.2014
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.07.2014  [2014/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUMIMOTO Katsuyuki
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / SASAKI Junya
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2012/37]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date09851101.706.11.2009
WO2009JP68987
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2011055449
Date:12.05.2011
Language:JA
[2011/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2498394
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.05.2011
ClassificationIPC:H02P9/14
[2012/37]
CPC:
H02P9/305 (EP,US); H02P9/14 (KR); H02J7/00302 (EP,US);
H02J7/0047 (EP,US); H02J7/14 (EP); H02P9/48 (EP,US);
H02P2101/45 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/37]
TitleGerman:REGLER FÜR VON EINEM FAHRZEUG ERZEUGTE SPANNUNG[2012/37]
English:VEHICLE GENERATED VOLTAGE CONTROL DEVICE[2012/37]
French:DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE DE LA TENSION PRODUITE PAR UN VÉHICULE[2012/37]
Entry into regional phase30.01.2012Translation filed 
30.01.2012National basic fee paid 
30.01.2012Search fee paid 
30.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/37]
23.06.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
16.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPS5082515  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.);
 [Y]JPS6439237  (NIPPON DENSO CO);
 [Y]JPH02262900  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JPH0481901  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JP2002369595  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP)
by applicantJP2009189140
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.