Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2500132

EP2500132 - MACHINE TOOL CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.09.2013
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2013Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 23.10.2013  [2013/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
[2012/38]
Inventor(s)01 / YASUDA, Chiaki
c/o Takasago Research & Development Center
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome
Takasago, Hyogo-ken 676-8686 / JP
02 / UMEHARA, Ryuichi
c/o Takasago Research & Development Center
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome
Takasago, Hyogo-ken 676-8686 / JP
03 / INOUE, Atsushi
c/o Hiroshima Research & Development Center
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
6-22 Kan-on-shin-machi 4-chome, Nishi-ku
Hiroshima, Hiroshima-ken, 733-8553 / JP
04 / SHIMIZU, Nobuo
c/o Takasago Machinery Works
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome
Takasago
Hyogo-ken 676-8686 / JP
05 / MATSUSHITA, Hirokazu
c/o Machine Tool Division
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
130, Roku-jizo, Ritto
Shiga-ken 520-3080 / JP
 [2012/38]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/38]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date09851275.913.11.2009
WO2009JP69342
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011058645
Date:19.05.2011
Language:JA
[2011/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2500132
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.05.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B23Q15/12, G05B19/18, B23Q17/09
[2013/22]
Former International [2012/38]B23Q15/12, G05B19/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN MASCHINENWERKZEUG[2012/38]
English:MACHINE TOOL CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE[2012/38]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MACHINE-OUTIL[2012/38]
Entry into regional phase20.04.2012Translation filed 
20.04.2012National basic fee paid 
20.04.2012Search fee paid 
20.04.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/38]
13.09.2013Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1296210  (MORI SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]; OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD [JP]; YAMAZAK) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * * paragraphs [0041] , [0 64] - [0069] *;
 [A]  - BRAVO ET AL, "Stability limits of milling considering the flexibility of the workpiece and the machine", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MACHINE TOOL DESIGN AND RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20051201), vol. 45, no. 15, doi:10.1016/J.IJMACHTOOLS.2005.03.004, ISSN 0020-7357, pages 1669 - 1680, XP005084069 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * table 1 * * section 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijmachtools.2005.03.004
 [A]  - YONG ZHOU ET AL, "Torsion Vibration Analysis of Lead-screw Feed Drives with Changeable Table Position and Work-piece Mass", MECHATRONICS AND AUTOMATION, 2007. ICMA 2007. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20070801), ISBN 978-1-4244-0827-6, pages 2194 - 2199, XP031135088 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 5 * * section III * * section V *
 [A]  - MANE ET AL, "Stability-based spindle speed control during flexible workpiece high-speed milling", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MACHINE TOOL DESIGN AND RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20071031), vol. 48, no. 2, ISSN 0020-7357, pages 184 - 194, XP022323197 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 5 * * section 2.1.2. *
International search[X]JP2005074569  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [Y]JP4075361B  (TOSHIBA CORP.)
by applicantJP2006150504