Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2506136

EP2506136 - DOCUMENT PROCESSING DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.02.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/40]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHIOHARA Tetsuya
C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2012/40]
Representative(s)Foxon, Rachel Siobhan
Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[2012/40]
Application number, filing date09851660.226.11.2009
WO2009JP69983
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011064869
Date:03.06.2011
Language:JA
[2011/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2506136
Date:03.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.06.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/12
[2012/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/40]
TitleGerman:DOKUMENTVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, STEUERVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2012/40]
English:DOCUMENT PROCESSING DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2012/40]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DOCUMENTS, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET PROGRAMME[2012/40]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2012Translation filed 
26.06.2012National basic fee paid 
26.06.2012Search fee paid 
26.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/40]
24.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.11.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination17.01.2017Appeal received No.  T1065/17
20.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
06.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.09.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
02.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[I]US2009219550  (LEVIN BURTON LEE [US] ET AL) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0076] * * figures 3, 4A, 4B, 5A, 5B *;
 [A]  - MICROSOFT WINDOWS, "PRINTTICKET AND PRINTCPABILITIES SUPPORT IN WINDOWS PRINT DRIVERS", INTERNET CITATION, (20060206), URL: http://www.microsoft.com/whdc/device/print/XPSDrv_PrintTicket.mspx, (20060206), XP007900384 [A] 1-13 * page 4 - page 9 *
International search[A]JP2009217443  (KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECH);
 [A]JP2003337675  (RISO KAGAKU CORP);
 [A]JP2009265772  (CANON KK);
 [A]JP2001134409  (CANON KK)
by applicantJPH11243463