Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2221573

EP2221573 - Remote controllable sampling wheel jettison and change device and use of same on a vehicle or building [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.11.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
04.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinmetall MAN Military Vehicles GmbH
Dachauer Strasse 655
80995 München / DE
[2015/20]
Former [2013/49]For all designated states
Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH
Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2
29345 Unterlüß / DE
Former [2010/34]For all designated states
Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH
Dr.-Hell-Strasse
24107 Kiel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gerlach, Klaus-Peter
Berliner Str. 10
34302 Guxhagen / DE
02 / Stulgies, Baldur
Wolfskaute 17
34359 Reinhardshagen / DE
03 / Bräutigam, Martin
Kölnische Str. 62B
34117 Kassel / DE
04 / Ludwig, Stefan
Gartenstr. 8
34125 Kassel / DE
 [2010/34]
Representative(s)Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Ganghoferstrasse 29a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/01]Dietrich, Barbara
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2010/34]Dietrich, Barbara
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date10001373.911.02.2010
[2010/34]
Priority number, dateDE2009101008321.02.2009         Original published format: DE102009010083
[2010/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2221573
Date:25.08.2010
Language:DE
[2010/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2221573
Date:04.04.2012
Language:DE
[2012/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2221573
Date:01.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:F41H7/03, G01N1/02
[2012/14]
Former International [2010/34]F41H7/03
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/34]
TitleGerman:Fernsteuerbare Spürradabwurf- und -wechselvorrichtung sowie Verwendung an einem Fahrzeug oder Objekt[2010/34]
English:Remote controllable sampling wheel jettison and change device and use of same on a vehicle or building[2010/34]
French:Dispositif de largage et de remplacement de roue d'échantillonage télécommandable ainsi qu'utilisation sur un véhicule ou un objet[2010/34]
Examination procedure01.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2012Examination requested  [2012/46]
20.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2013Fee for grant paid
18.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.09.2014   
Krauss-Maffei Wegmann GmbH & Co. KG
Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 11
80997 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Feder Walter Ebert
Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB
Achenbachstrasse 59
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/45]
Opponent(s)01  30.09.2014   
Krauss-Maffei Wegmann GmbH & Co. KG
Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 11
80997 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Feder Walter Ebert
Patentanwälte Achenbachstrasse 59
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
07.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition18.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1245/16
06.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.02.2010
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
MK01.01.2014
MT01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
SM01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
LU11.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
GB01.04.2014
NO01.04.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU11.02.2010
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
MT01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
SM01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
LU11.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
GB01.04.2014
NO01.04.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2016/32]HU11.02.2010
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
MT01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
SM01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
GB01.04.2014
NO01.04.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2016/28]BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
MT01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
SM01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
GB01.04.2014
NO01.04.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2016/23]CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
MT01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
SM01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
GB01.04.2014
NO01.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2016/22]CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
MT01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
SM01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
GB01.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2016/12]CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
MT01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
GB01.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/24]CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
GB01.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/09]CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
GB01.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/08]CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/07]CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IE11.02.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/50]CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/46]CY01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY01.01.2014
HR01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4238399  (BRUKER FRANZEN ANALYTIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 16; figures 1-4d *;
 [A]DE8424372U  (ODENWALDWERKE RITTERSBACH, KERN & GROSSKINSKY) [A] 1-8 * page 7, line 9 - line 29; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE9100367U  (ODENWALDWERKE RITTERSBACH GMBH FAHRZEUGBAU & KATASTROPHENSCHUTZSYST.) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [L]DE202011003927U  (WEIDELT SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG A [DE]) [L] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantDE4238399