Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2357069

EP2357069 - Mould, apparatus and method for manufacturing a composite part including at least one fibre reinforced matrix [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
27.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S
Borupvej 16
7330 Brande / DK
[2019/31]
Former [2017/35]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
Former [2013/11]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2011/33]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Christiansen, Lars, Fuglsang
Flydedokken 11. 1th
9000 Aalborg / DK
02 / Hansen, Svend Lynge Schultz
Rosengaarden 26
9200 Aalborg SV / DK
03 / Jacobsen, Ib
Halsmandsbrovej 4j
9240 Nibe / DK
04 / Jakobsen, Johnny
Marie Curis Alle 11, 1th
9220 Aalborg East / DK
05 / Jensen, Michael
Anne Mariesvej 12
9000 Aalborg / DK
 [2011/33]
Representative(s)Aspacher, Karl-Georg
Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG
Otto-Hahn-Ring 6
81739 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/48](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date10001532.015.02.2010
[2011/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2357069
Date:17.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2357069
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:B29C33/02, B29C33/38, B29C35/02
[2011/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/33]
TitleGerman:Gussform, Werkzeug und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Verbundteils, das mindestens eine faserverstärkte Matrix enthält[2011/33]
English:Mould, apparatus and method for manufacturing a composite part including at least one fibre reinforced matrix[2011/33]
French:Moule, appareil et méthode pour fabriquer une pièce composite incluant au moins une matrice renforcée par fibre[2011/33]
Examination procedure15.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/43]
14.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2012Fee for grant paid
19.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.08.2013   
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Kent, Peter Joseph, et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2013/40]
Opponent(s)01  28.08.2013   
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Kent, Peter Joseph, et al
Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
02.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition26.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0185/16
30.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
29.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0185/16
17.05.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2016/21]
02.06.2016Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/23]
17.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.02.2010
AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IS28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MK28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
SM28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
IE15.02.2013
LU15.02.2013
BG28.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
HR31.07.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2015/34]HU15.02.2010
AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MK28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
SM28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
IE15.02.2013
LU15.02.2013
BG28.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
HR31.07.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/32]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MK28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
SM28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
IE15.02.2013
BG28.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
HR31.07.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/24]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
SM28.11.2012
IE15.02.2013
BG28.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
HR31.07.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
IE15.02.2013
BG28.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
HR31.07.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/32]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
IE15.02.2013
BG28.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
HR31.07.2013
Former [2014/09]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
IE15.02.2013
BG28.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
HR31.07.2013
Former [2014/07]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
IE15.02.2013
BG28.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/52]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/42]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/37]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/28]BE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/27]BE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
Former [2013/26]FI28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
Former [2013/23]FI28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
Former [2013/20]LT28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE102006058198  (FACHHOCHSCHULE DORTMUND [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] , [0022] , [0048] , [0050] * * figure 1 * [Y] 4,5,9-12,14,15 [I] 8;
 [XI]DE202009010891U  (SUZHOU RED MAPLE WIND BLADE MO [CN]) [X] 1-5,9-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] , [0006] , [0008] , [0012] , [0025] , [0029] * * figure 1 * [I] 6-8;
 [XYI]US5190715  (YAMADA AKIYOSHI [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13 * figure 2 * * column 8, line 50 - line 58 * * column 9, line 57 - line 60 * * column 10, line 1 - line 47 * [Y] 4,5,9-12,14,15 [I] 8;
 [Y]US5158132  (GUILLEMOT GERARD [FR]) [Y] 4,5,9-12,14,15 * column 1, line 7 - line 27 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 49 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 7 * * column 10, line 19 - line 24 *
by applicantEP1310351