Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2189480

EP2189480 - Process for brominating polystyrenic resins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.10.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Albemarle Corporation
451 Florida Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US
[2010/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Dadgar, Billie B.
1500 East University
Magnolia, Arkansas 71753 / US
02 / Balhoff, Donald E.
10535 Ridgely Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70809 / US
03 / Kolich, Charles H.
11804 Parkbrook Avenue
Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US
04 / Ao, Meng-Sheng
25750 Lakeside Drive
Glen Ellyn, Illinois 60137-7903 / US
05 / Lin, Homer, C.
2823, Galahad Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US
 [2010/42]
Former [2010/21]01 / Dadgar, Billie B.
240 Leeward Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US
02 / Balhoff, Donald E.
10535 Ridgely Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70809 / US
03 / Kolich, Charles H.
11804 Parkbrook Avenue
Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US
04 / Ao, Meng-Sheng
5443 Lost Oak Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US
05 / Lin, Homer, C.
2823, Galahad Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2010/21]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date10001769.807.04.1998
[2010/21]
Priority number, dateUS1997085246207.05.1997         Original published format: US 852462
[2010/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2189480
Date:26.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2189480
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:C08F12/08, C08K5/02
[2010/21]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2014/33]
Former [2010/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Brominierung von Polystyrolharzen[2010/21]
English:Process for brominating polystyrenic resins[2010/21]
French:Procédé de brome pour résines polystyréniques[2010/21]
Examination procedure22.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/21]
17.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2014Fee for grant paid
27.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02028732.2  / EP1293518
EP98914612.1  / EP0980394
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980914612) is  02.05.2001
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.09.2015   
Bromine Compounds Ltd.
P.O. Box 180
Makleff House
12 Kroitzer St.
84101 Beer-Sheva / IL
Opponent's representative
Croce, Valeria, et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
 [2015/41]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
12.10.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.04.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.10.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition22.11.2017Appeal received No.  T2531/17
16.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
16.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 16
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 17
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB06.04.2018
[2018/37]
Documents cited:Search[XPI]WO9813396  (ALBEMARLE CORP [US]) [XP] 1-8 * page 7, line 1 - page 7, line 9; example -; claim - * [I] 1-8
by applicantUS4200703
 US4352909
 US4975496
 US5532322
 EP0201411