EP2213594 - Conveyor for transporting bottles, preforms or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS, S.A.S. Avenue de La Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville-sur-Mer / FR | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaiber, Franz Akbstrasse 4 78564 Wehingen / DE | 02 /
Novak, Peter Oberstrasse 16 8274 Tägerwilen / CH | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [2010/31] | Stern, Urs Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10001941.3 | 08.09.2006 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | DE20051043282 | 09.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005043282 | DE20061038320 | 15.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006038320 | [2010/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213594 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213594 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65G15/14, B65G19/02, B29C49/42 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
B65G19/025 (EP,US);
B65G15/14 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3024 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/4205 (EP,US);
B29C49/42069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Transportieren von Gegenständen mit einer Profilierung, insbesondere von Flaschen oder Vorformelingen | [2010/31] | English: | Conveyor for transporting bottles, preforms or the like | [2010/31] | French: | Conyoyeur pour le transport de bouteilles, préformes ou équivalents | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 04.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06805672.0 / EP1922269 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060805672) is 18.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 18.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2006 | CY | 29.05.2013 | CZ | 29.05.2013 | DK | 29.05.2013 | EE | 29.05.2013 | FI | 29.05.2013 | LT | 29.05.2013 | LV | 29.05.2013 | MC | 29.05.2013 | NL | 29.05.2013 | PL | 29.05.2013 | RO | 29.05.2013 | SE | 29.05.2013 | SI | 29.05.2013 | SK | 29.05.2013 | TR | 29.05.2013 | BG | 29.08.2013 | GR | 30.08.2013 | AT | 08.09.2013 | IE | 08.09.2013 | LU | 08.09.2013 | ES | 09.09.2013 | IS | 29.09.2013 | BE | 30.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | PT | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 29.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
AT | 08.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 29.05.2013 | |
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
AT | 08.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CZ | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
AT | 08.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CZ | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CZ | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 29.05.2013 | |
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | DK | 29.05.2013 | |
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
PT | 30.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4479574 (JULIUS RICHARD F [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * figure 4 *; | [A]DE3515353 (SEITZ ENZINGER NOLL MASCH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]IT1239102 (NUOVA O M I P) [A] 4,5,7-9,13; | [Y]WO9710163 (SASIB BEVERAGE MEDIUM SPEED S [IT], et al) [Y] 4-8 * figure 4; claim 5 *; | [A]JPH111212 (KIRIN BEVERAGE KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]DE29901401U (STORK NOLTE EMT B V [NL]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 6; figure 3A * [Y] 4-8; | [A]DE19821105 (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 2,3 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 27; figure - *; | [A]WO0185580 (PRIERO MARCO [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document * * figure 2A *; | [A]DE20110929U (WIPPERMANN JR GMBH [DE]) [A] 4* abstract * |