EP2308555 - System for detecting hypoglycemia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/15] | System for detecting hypoglycemia, hyperglycemia and cardiac ischemia | ||
[2015/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91392-9221 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91392-9221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gill, Jong 23310 Mariner Lane Valencia California 91355 / US | 02 /
Boileau, Peter 23933 Del Monte Drive, Unit 19 Valencia CA 91355 / US | 03 /
Bharmi, Rupinder 25399 The Old Road Stevenson Ranch CA 91381 / US | 04 /
Min, Xiaoyi 3228 Versaille Court Thousand Oaks California 91362 / US | 05 /
Florio, Joseph, J. 1816 NW Duniway Ct. Bend Oregon 97701-5605 / US | 06 /
Benser, Michael 24353 Astor Racing Court Valencia CA 91354 / US | 07 /
Bornzin, Gene, A. 608 Stonebrook Street Simi Valley CA 93065 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
Gill, Jong 23310 Mariner Lane Valencia California 91355 / US | ||
02 /
Boileau, Peter 23933 Del Monte Drive, Unit 19 Valencia CA 91355 / US | |||
03 /
Bharmi, Rupinder 25399 The Old Road Stevenson Ranch CA 91381 / US | |||
04 /
Min, Xiaoyi 3228 Versaile Court Thousand Oaks California 91362 / US | |||
05 /
Florio, Joseph, J. 1816 NW Duniway Ct. Bend Oregon 97701-5605 / US | |||
06 /
Benser, Michael 24353 Astor Racing Court Valencia CA 91354 / US | |||
07 /
Bornzin, Gene, A. 608 Stonebrook Street Simi Valley CA 93065 / US | Representative(s) | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/10] | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/15] | Phillips, Emily Elizabeth, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10001990.0 | 25.01.2006 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | US20050043612 | 25.01.2005 Original published format: US 43612 | US20050043780 | 25.01.2005 Original published format: US 43780 | US20050043804 | 25.01.2005 Original published format: US 43804 | US20050127370 | 11.05.2005 Original published format: US 127370 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2308555 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2308555 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2308555 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/362, A61N1/368, A61B5/0468, A61N1/365, A61N1/39, A61B5/0452, A61M5/142, // A61B5/00, A61B5/145 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
A61N1/3962 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/349 (EP);
A61B5/358 (US);
A61B5/364 (EP,US);
A61N1/3621 (EP,US);
A61N1/3627 (EP,US);
A61N1/36557 (EP,US);
A61N1/3925 (EP,US);
A61N1/39622 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | A61N1/362, A61N1/368, A61B5/0468, A61N1/365, A61N1/39, A61B5/0452, A61B5/00, A61B5/145, // A61B5/00, A61B5/145 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2011/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Erkennung von Hypoglykämie | [2015/17] | English: | System for detecting hypoglycemia | [2015/17] | French: | Système pour détecter l'hypoglycémie | [2015/17] |
Former [2011/15] | System zur Erkennung von Hypoglykämie, Hyperglykämie und Herzischämie | ||
Former [2011/15] | System for detecting hypoglycemia, hyperglycemia and cardiac ischemia | ||
Former [2011/15] | Système pour détecter l'hypoglycémie, l'hyperglycémie et l'ischémie cardiaque | Examination procedure | 07.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 29.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06719544.6 / EP1850909 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060719544) is 05.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2006 | AT | 09.09.2015 | BE | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | ES | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | NL | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | GB | 25.01.2016 | IE | 25.01.2016 | LU | 25.01.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 25.01.2006 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.01.2006 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0472411 (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5792065 (XUE QIUZHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0867146 (PACESETTER AB [SE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1419731 (PACESETTER INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - HARRIS N D ET AL, "Can changes in QT interval be used to predict the onset of hypoglycemia in type 1 diabetes?", COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY 2000 CAMBRIDGE, MA, USA 24-27 SEPT. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20000924), ISBN 0-7803-6557-7, pages 375 - 378, XP010528576 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIC.2000.898535 | [A] - RANA BUSHRA S ET AL, "Relation of QT interval dispersion to the number of different cardiac abnormalities in diabetes mellitus.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CARDIOLOGY. 1 SEP 2002, (20020901), vol. 90, no. 5, ISSN 0002-9149, pages 483 - 487, XP002383130 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9149(02)02518-3 | [A] - OKIN PETER M ET AL, "Electrocardiographic repolarization complexity and abnormality predict all-cause and cardiovascular mortality in diabetes: the strong heart study.", DIABETES. FEB 2004, (200402), vol. 53, no. 2, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 434 - 440, XP002383131 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.53.2.434 | by applicant | US4731051 | US4947845 | US5113869 | US5135004 | US5199428 | US5203326 | US5313953 | US5741211 | US5960797 | US6016443 | US6021350 | US6108577 | US6112116 | US6115628 | US6128526 | US6233486 | US6256538 | US6264606 | US6272379 | US6377852 | US6381493 | US2002143372 | US6501983 | US6572542 | WO2004007796 | US2004077962 | US2004138716 | - ECKERT ET AL., "Hypoglycemia Leads to an Increased QT Interval in Normal Men", CLINICAL PHYSIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 98, no. 6, page 570 | - HELLER, "Abnormalities of the Electrocardiogram during Hypoglycaemia: The Cause of the Dead in Bed Syndrome", INT. J. GLIN. PRACT., (200207), pages 27 - 32 | - MCCARTHY ET AL., Mild hypoglycemia and impairment of brain stem and cortical evoked potentials in healthy subjects., YALE UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE | - ROBINSON ET AL., "Changes In Cardiac Repolarization During Clinical Episodes Of Nocturnal Hypoglycaemia In Adults With Type 1 Diabetes", DIABETOLOGIA, (20040108), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 312 - 5 | US20030603429 | US20030603398 | US20050117624 |