Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2192380

EP2192380 - Method of measuring an object using a coordinate measuring machine and coordinate measuring machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Werth Messtechnik GmbH
Siemensstrasse 19
35394 Giessen / DE
[2010/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Christoph, Ralf, Dr.
Siemenstrasse 19
35394 Gießen / DE
02 / Rauh, Wolfgang, Dr.
Am Mehrdrusch 16
35094 Lahntal-Goßfelden / DE
 [2010/22]
Representative(s)Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert
Patentanwalt
Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b
63450 Hanau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/22]Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert
Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b
63450 Hanau / DE
Application number, filing date10002412.424.05.2005
[2010/22]
Priority number, dateDE2004102635726.05.2004         Original published format: DE102004026357
DE2004105025714.10.2004         Original published format: DE102004050257
DE2005101844720.04.2005         Original published format: DE102005018447
[2010/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2192380
Date:02.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2192380
Date:23.06.2010
[2010/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01B21/04, G01N23/04
[2010/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Messen eines Objektes mit einem Koordinatenmessgerät sowie Koordinatenmessgerät[2010/22]
English:Method of measuring an object using a coordinate measuring machine and coordinate measuring machine[2010/22]
French:Procédé de mesure d'un objet utilisant une machine de mesure de coordonnées et machine de mesure de coordonnées[2010/22]
Examination procedure16.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/04]
03.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.10.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/51]
Appeal following examination27.09.2017Appeal received No.  T0057/18
27.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
22.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn
22.12.2011Appeal received No.  T0462/12
17.02.2012Statement of grounds filed
12.09.2013Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
22.10.2019Date of oral proceedings
25.10.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05750966.3  / EP1749190
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050750966) is  12.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
23.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
01.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
30.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0875751  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 4, line 30 - column 8, line 58; figures 1-8 *;
 [XA]EP1380263  (MYCRONA GES FUER INNOVATIVE ME [DE]) [X] 1-14 * column 13, line 2 - column 16, line 57; figure 1 * [A] 15;
 [XA]US4422177  (MASTRONARDI RICHARD [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6,8-13,15 * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 34; figures 1,2 * [A] 7,14;
 [XA]EP1186855  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-13 * column 4, line 31 - column 7, line 22; figures 1,2 * [A] 7,14,15;
 [XP]WO2004051311  (VARIAN MED SYS TECH INC [US]) [XP] 1-6,8-13,15 * page 11, line 18 - page 39, line 13; figures 1-13 *