Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2365669

EP2365669 - Method and device for electronic service of certified electronic messages [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2014
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cepris d.o.o.
Hocka ulica 17
2000 Maribor / SI
[2011/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Kezmah, Bostjan
Hlebova ulica 5
2000 Maribor / SI
02 / Kezmah, Urska
Hlebova ulica 5
2000 Maribor / SI
03 / Hericko, Marjan
Azbetova ulica 6
2000 Maribor / SI
 [2011/37]
Representative(s)Marn, Jure
Ljubljanska ulica 9
2000 Maribor / SI
[2011/37]
Application number, filing date10002543.610.03.2010
[2011/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2365669
Date:14.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2365669
Date:31.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/58
[2011/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/37]
Extension statesBA11.03.2010
RS11.03.2010
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für elektronischen Dienst zertifizierter elektronischer Nachrichten[2011/37]
English:Method and device for electronic service of certified electronic messages[2011/37]
French:Procédé et dispositif de service électronique de messages électroniques certifiés[2011/37]
Examination procedure11.03.2010Examination requested  [2011/37]
14.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
18.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2013Fee for grant paid
26.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.05.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.07.2012
Opposition(s)02.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.03.2010
BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
TR31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
GB10.03.2014
IE10.03.2014
LU10.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU10.03.2010
BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
GB10.03.2014
IE10.03.2014
LU10.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/28]BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
GB10.03.2014
IE10.03.2014
LU10.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
GB10.03.2014
IE10.03.2014
LU10.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/22]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
SM31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
GB10.03.2014
IE10.03.2014
LU10.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/12]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
GB10.03.2014
IE10.03.2014
LU10.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/09]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
GB10.03.2014
IE10.03.2014
LU10.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
IE10.03.2014
LU10.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
IE10.03.2014
LU10.03.2014
Former [2014/48]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
LU10.03.2014
Former [2014/24]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/23]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/22]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/21]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/18]BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/14]CY19.06.2013
BE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY19.06.2013
BE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY19.06.2013
BE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY19.06.2013
BE31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/09]BE31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO31.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6137884  (MICALI SILVIO [US]) [X] 1,8 * column 1, line 29 - line 67 * * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 45 * * column 11, line 63 - column 13, line 19; figure 2 * [Y] 2-7;
 [XY]FR2839406  (EMAIL AR [FR]) [X] 1,8 * page 4, line 10 - page 13, line 9 * [Y] 2-7;
 [XY]EP1646194  (SAGEM COMM [FR]) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007] - [0011] - [0026] - [0034] - [0053] - [0057]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-7;
 [XI]  - GENNAI A SHAHIN ISTI-CNR C PETRUCCI A VINCIARELLI DIGITPA F, "Certified Electronic Mail; draft-gennai-smime-cnipa-pec-06.txt", CERTIFIED ELECTRONIC MAIL; DRAFT-GENNAI-SMIME-CNIPA-PEC-06.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20100308), no. 6, pages 1 - 63, XP015067819 [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * [I] 2-7